EP1228026 - 15-HYDROXYEICOSATETRAENOIC ACID-RELATED COMPOUNDS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcon, Inc. Bösch 69 6331 Hünenberg / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states Alcon Inc. Bösch 69 6331 Hünenberg / CH | ||
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states Alcon Universal, Ltd. Bosch 69, P.O. Box 62 6331 Hünenberg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELLBERG, Mark, R. 5211 Overridge Drive Arlington, TX 76017 / US | 02 /
YANNI, John, M. 2821 Donnybrook Drive Burleson, TX 76028 / US | 03 /
GRAFF, Gustav 6500 Country Road 809 Cleburne, TX 76031 / US | 04 /
GAMACHE, Daniel, A. 5610 Hunterwood Lane Arlington, TX 76017 / US | 05 /
KLIMKO, Peter, G. 2115 Pembroke Drive Fort Worth, TX 76110 / US | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Best, Michael, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | Best, Michael, Dr., et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00982056.4 | 23.10.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000US29256 | Priority number, date | US19990164376P | 09.11.1999 Original published format: US 164376 P | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0134547 | Date: | 17.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1228026 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1228026 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07C59/00 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
C07C59/58 (EP,US);
A61K31/202 (KR);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/04 (EP);
C07C59/42 (EP,US);
C07C59/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/32] | Title | German: | 15-HYDROXYEICOSATETRAENSÄURE VERWANDTE VERBINDUNGEN UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2002/32] | English: | 15-HYDROXYEICOSATETRAENOIC ACID-RELATED COMPOUNDS AND METHODS OF USE | [2002/32] | French: | COMPOSES APPARENTES A L'ACIDE 15-HYDROXYEICOSATETRAENOIQUE ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | [2002/32] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 23.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA] - HADJIAGAPIOU C ET AL, "METABOLISM OF 15 HYDROXY-5 8 11 13-EICOSATETRAENOIC ACID BY MOLT-4 CELLS AND BLOOD T-LYMPHOCYTES", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1990), vol. 265, no. 8, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 4369 - 4373, XP002165694 [DA] 1 * abstract * | [DA] - HAVIV F ET AL, "STRUCTURAL REQUIREMENTS FOR THE INHIBITION OF 5 LIPOXYGENASE BY 15 HYDROXYEICOSA-5 8 11 13-TETRAENOIC ACID ANALOGUES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1987), vol. 30, no. 2, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 254 - 263, XP002165695 [DA] 1 * tables 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00385a005 | [DA] - LUMIN, S ET AL, "Total synthesis of 5(s),20- and 15(s),20-dihydroxyeicosatetraenoic acid and 5(s),6(r)-epoxy-20-hydroxy- and 14(r),15(s)-epoxy-20-hydroxyeicosatrienoic acid", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATION, pages 389 - 390, XP002165696 [DA] 1 * page 390, column 1 - column 2 * |