EP1244784 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INHIBITING NEOPLASTIC CELL GROWTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHKENAZI, Avi, J. 1456 Tarrytown Street San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 02 /
GODDARD, Audrey 110 Congo Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | 03 /
GURNEY, Austin, L. 1 Debbie Lane Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 04 /
NAPIER, Mary, A. 1015 Hayne Road Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US | 05 /
WATANABE, Colin, K. 128 Corliss Drive Moraga, CA 94556 / US | 06 /
WOOD, William, I. 35 Southdown Court Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US | [2002/40] | Representative(s) | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00982096.0 | 08.11.2000 | [2002/40] | WO2000US30952 | Priority number, date | WO2000US00376 | 06.01.2000 Original published format: PCT/US00/00376 | WO2000US04342 | 18.02.2000 Original published format: PCT/US00/04342 | WO2000US05841 | 02.03.2000 Original published format: PCT/US00/05841 | WO2000US08439 | 30.03.2000 Original published format: PCT/US00/08439 | WO2000US20710 | 28.07.2000 Original published format: PCT/US00/20710 | [2002/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0149715 | Date: | 12.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1244784 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/71, A61K38/18, A61K39/395, C12N15/62, C07K16/28 | [2002/40] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP);
C07K14/705 (EP);
C07K14/71 (EP);
C07K16/18 (EP);
A61K2039/54 (EP);
A61K2039/545 (EP);
A61K2039/55566 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HEMMUNG DES WACHSTUMS VON NEOPLASTISCHEN ZELLEN | [2002/40] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INHIBITING NEOPLASTIC CELL GROWTH | [2002/40] | French: | METHODES ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT D'INHIBER LA CROISSANCE CELLULAIRE NEOPLASIQUE | [2002/40] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 27.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0315289 (ONCOGEN [US]); | [A]WO9115510 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]); | [A]WO9509005 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]); | [X]WO9963088 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [PXL]WO0053755 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [EL]WO0073454 (GENENTECH INC); | [EL]WO0100661 (GENSET SA [FR], et al); | [EL]WO0109327 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) | Examination | WO9117183 | WO0046380 |