EP1233783 - HBV/HCV VIRUS-LIKE PARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHIRON CORPORATION 4560 Horton Street Emeryville CA 94608-2916 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states CHIRON CORPORATION 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, California 94608 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SELBY, Mark, Chiron Corporation 4560 Horton Street, R-440 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | 02 /
GLAZER, Edward, Chiron Corporation 4560 Horton Street, R-440 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | 03 /
HOUGHTON, Michael, Chiron Corporation 4560 Horton Street, R-440 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels and Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00982225.5 | 22.11.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000US32249 | Priority number, date | US19990167224P | 24.11.1999 Original published format: US 167224 P | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0138358 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1233783 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1233783 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1233783 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/295, C07K19/00, A61P31/12, C12N15/62, C12N5/10 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
A61K39/292 (EP);
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP);
A61K2039/5256 (EP);
A61K2039/5258 (EP);
A61K2039/53 (EP);
A61K2039/6075 (EP);
C07K2319/735 (EP);
C12N2730/10122 (EP);
C12N2730/10134 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HBV/HCV Virus-ºhnliche Particle | [2005/50] | English: | HBV/HCV VIRUS-LIKE PARTICLE | [2002/35] | French: | PARTICULE DE TYPE VIRUS HBV/HCV | [2002/35] |
Former [2002/35] | HBV/HCV VIRUS-ÄHNLICHE TEILCHEN | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 20.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04078119.7 / EP1535628 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 09.03.2005 | TR | 09.03.2005 | DK | 09.06.2005 | GR | 09.06.2005 | SE | 09.06.2005 | ES | 20.06.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/51] | FI | 09.03.2005 | |
TR | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
ES | 20.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 09.03.2005 | |
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
ES | 20.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 09.03.2005 | |
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 09.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]KR970010787 ; | [A]EP0201416 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR]) [A] * the whole document *; | [DA]US5098704 (VALENZUELA PABLO D T [US]) [DA] * the whole document *; | [DX] - LEE IHL-HEE ET AL, "Presentation of the hydrophilic domains of hepatitis C viral E2 envelope glycoprotein on hepatitis B surface antigen particles.", JOURNAL OF MEDICAL VIROLOGY, (1996), vol. 50, no. 2, ISSN 0146-6615, pages 145 - 151, XP000990962 [DX] 1-78 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1096-9071(199610)50:2<145::AID-JMV7>3.0.CO;2-A | [X] - LEE, DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 14, Database accession no. 1998-156879, XP002164673 & KR970010787 A 19970327 (LG CHEM LTD) [X] 1-78 * the whole document * | [X] - MAJOR MARIAN E ET AL, "DNA-based immunization with chimeric vectors for the induction of immune responses against the hepatitis C virus nucleocapsid.", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1995), vol. 69, no. 9, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 5798 - 5805, XP002164671 [X] 1-78 * the whole document * | [DX] - INCHAUSPE G ET AL, "DNA vaccination for the induction of immune responses against hepatitis C virus proteins", VACCINE,GB,BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, (19970601), vol. 15, no. 8, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 853 - 856, XP004075669 [DX] 1-78 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(96)00275-7 | [DX] - NAKANO ISAO ET AL, "Immunization with plasmid DNA encoding hepatitis C virus envelope E2 antigenic domains induces antibodies whose immune reactivity is linked to the injection mode.", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1997), vol. 71, no. 9, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 7101 - 7109, XP002164672 [DX] 1-78 * the whole document * |