EP1242330 - SOLUBILIZED DEFOAMERS FOR CEMENTITIOUS COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Construction Research & Technology GmbH Dr.-Albert-Frank-Str. 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Construction Research & Technology GmbH Dr.Albert-Frank-Strasse 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | ||
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states MBT HOLDING AG Vulkanstrasse 110 8048 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHENDY, Samy, M. 3285 Bailey Road Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44221 / US | 02 /
BURY, Jeffrey, R. 873 Iroquois Trail Macedonia, OH 44056 / US | 03 /
LUCIANO, John 8526 Silvercreek Russell, OH 44072 / US | 04 /
VICKERS, Thomas, M., Jr. 10140 Weathersfield Drive Concord Township, OH 44060 / US | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Spott, Gottfried, et al Spott & Weinmiller Patentanwälte Fasanenstrasse 159 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Spott, Gottfried, Dr., et al Spott & Weinmiller Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/32] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2002/39] | McStea, John Anthony Patents & Trade Marks, MBT (Schweiz) AG, Vulkanstrasse 110 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 00983237.9 | 06.12.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000EP12315 | Priority number, date | US19990170062P | 10.12.1999 Original published format: US 170062 P | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0142162 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1242330 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1242330 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/02, C04B24/32 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
C04B40/0039 (EP,US);
B01D19/04 (EP,US);
B01D19/0404 (EP,US);
C04B24/2647 (EP,US);
C04B24/2688 (EP,US);
C04B24/2694 (EP,US);
C04B24/32 (EP,US);
C04B28/02 (EP,US);
C09K23/017 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01D19/0404, B01D19/0409, B01D19/0413, B01D19/0418 (EP,US);
C04B40/0039, C04B24/003, C04B24/2647, C04B24/2664, C04B28/02, C04B2103/304 (EP,US);
C04B40/0039, C04B24/023, C04B24/267, C04B2103/304, C04B2103/408 (US,EP);
C04B40/0039, C04B24/02, C04B24/2647, C04B24/34, C04B28/02, C04B2103/304 (US,EP);
C04B40/0039, C04B24/085, C04B24/20, C04B24/2647, C04B28/02, C04B2103/304 (EP,US);
C04B40/0039, C04B24/2647, C04B24/32, C04B24/42, C04B28/02, C04B2103/304 (EP,US);
C04B40/0039, C04B24/267, C04B2103/304, C04B2103/408, C04B2103/50 (US,EP);
C04B40/0039, C04B24/32, C04B28/02, C04B2103/304, C04B2103/408, C04B2103/50 (US,EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GELÖSTE ENTSCHÄUMER FÜR ZEMENTZUSAMENSETZUNGEN | [2002/39] | English: | SOLUBILIZED DEFOAMERS FOR CEMENTITIOUS COMPOSITIONS | [2002/39] | French: | DEMOUSSEURS SOLUBILISES POUR COMPOSITIONS A BASE DE CIMENT | [2002/39] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 10.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.06.2005 | BE | 29.06.2005 | ES | 29.06.2005 | FI | 29.06.2005 | NL | 29.06.2005 | TR | 29.06.2005 | DK | 29.09.2005 | GR | 29.09.2005 | SE | 29.09.2005 | CY | 06.12.2005 | IE | 06.12.2005 | PT | 07.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
ES | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
TR | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
IE | 06.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
TR | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
IE | 06.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
IE | 06.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 29.06.2005 | |
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 29.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4209336 (PREVITE ROBERT W [US]) [A] 1,2,7 * example III; tables XXI,XXII * * claims 1,2,8-12 *; | JPH04209737 [ ] (ONODA CEMENT CO LTD, et al); | [A]GB2280180 (SANDOZ LTD [CH], et al) [A] 1,4,7,8 * page 1, line 17 - page 2, line 21 * * page 13, line 16 - page 14, line 22 * * page 38, line 17 - line 23 * * claims 1,2,6-8; table - *; | [X]WO9831643 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * page 3, line 7 - page 16, line 21 * * examples 1,4 *; | [X]FR2760004 (CHRYSO [FR]) [X] 1,3-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0930321 (DOW EUROP SA [CH], et al) [A] 1,7 * page 2, line 3 - line 7 * * page 3, line 37 - page 4, line 34 * * page 9, line 38 - page 10, line 8 *; | [A] - KODA ET AL, "Self-leveling cement composition with good flowability for floors", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930125), vol. 118, no. 4, Database accession no. 26621, XP000353054 [A] 1,7 * abstract * | by applicant | US5158996 | US5162402 | US5494516 | EP0753488 | US5612396 | US5660626 | US5668195 | US5798425 | US6063184 | - M.E.L. McBain and E. Hutchinson, "SOLUBILIZATIONAND RELATED PHENOMENA", Academic Press, New York1955 | - SMITH D., "MICROEMULSIONS", ENCYCLOPEDIA OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY, KIRK OTHMER, (1999), vol. 4TH ED. | - "HLB", THE ATLAS HLB SYSTEM, WILMINGTON, DELAWARE, ATLAS CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, (1963), vol. 4TH ED | - "EMULSIONS", ULLMANS'S ENCYCLOPEDIA OF INDUSTRIAL CHEMISTRY, (1987), vol. 5TH ED | - FOX C., "Rationale for the Selection of Emulsifying Agents", COSMETICS & TOILETRIES, (1986), vol. 101, no. 11, pages 25 - 44 | - GRACIAA, A.J. ET AL., "A Study of the Required Hydrophile-Lipophile Balance for Emulsification", LANGMUIR, (1989), vol. 5, pages 1215 - 1318 | - GRIFFIN W.C., "EMULSIONS", KIRK OTHMER ENCYCLOPEDIA OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY, (1979), vol. 3TH ED |