EP1250527 - INTAKE SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH A MEMBRANE THAT IS MAINLY PERMEABLE TO OXYGEN MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mann + Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2003/51] |
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states FILTERWERK MANN & HUMMEL GmbH 71631 Ludwigsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Olaf Pforzheimer Strasse 71 71292 Friolzheim / DE | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Voth, Gerhard Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | Voth, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Filterwerk Mann+Hummel GmbH 71631 Ludwigsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00983269.2 | 09.12.2000 | [2002/43] | WO2000EP12461 | Priority number, date | DE20001003525 | 27.01.2000 Original published format: DE 10003525 | [2002/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0155580 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1250527 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1250527 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/12 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
F02M35/10019 (EP,US);
B01D53/22 (EP,US);
B01D63/00 (EP,US);
B01D63/02 (EP,US);
F02M25/12 (EP,US);
F02M35/02 (EP,US);
F02M35/10301 (EP,US);
F02M35/161 (EP,US);
B01D2313/23 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANSAUGSYSTEM FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT EINER VORNEHMLICH FÜR SAUERSTOFFMOLEKÜLE DURCHLÄSSIGEN MEMBRAN | [2002/43] | English: | INTAKE SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH A MEMBRANE THAT IS MAINLY PERMEABLE TO OXYGEN MOLECULES | [2002/43] | French: | SYSTEME D'ADMISSION POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE, DOTE D'UNE MEMBRANE PERMEABLE PRINCIPALEMENT AUX MOLECULES D'OXYGENE | [2002/43] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 20.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/03] | Request for further processing for: | 25.04.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 25.04.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.05.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.02.2007 | DK | 07.02.2007 | FI | 07.02.2007 | IE | 07.02.2007 | IT | 07.02.2007 | NL | 07.02.2007 | TR | 07.02.2007 | SE | 07.05.2007 | GR | 08.05.2007 | PT | 09.07.2007 | [2019/12] |
Former [2018/28] | CY | 07.02.2007 | |
DK | 07.02.2007 | ||
ES | 07.02.2007 | ||
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
IT | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
TR | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/42] | CY | 07.02.2007 | |
DK | 07.02.2007 | ||
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
IT | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
TR | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 07.02.2007 | |
DK | 07.02.2007 | ||
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
IT | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 07.02.2007 | |
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
IT | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | DK | 07.02.2007 | |
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | DK | 07.02.2007 | |
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | DK | 07.02.2007 | |
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | FI | 07.02.2007 | |
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 07.02.2007 | |
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 07.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6011667 ; | [X]JPS6088858 ; | [X]JPS6095150 ; | [A]JPS6090975 ; | [DA]DE19710840 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]GB2339240 (WANG YIN JUNG [TW]) | by applicant | DE19710840 |