EP1237973 - IMPROVED REACTIVE HOT MELT ADHESIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H.B. FULLER LICENSING & FINANCING, INC. 1200 Willow Lake Boulevard, Box 64683 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55164-0683 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states H.B. Fuller Licensing & Financing, Inc. 1200 Willow Lake Boulevard, Box 64683 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55164-0683 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REID, Kevin, J. 1200 Willow Lake Boulevard, Box 64683 St. Paul, MN 55164-0683 / US | 02 /
HAIDER, Gary, J. 1200 Willow Lake Boulevard, Box 64683 St. Paul, MN 55164-0683 / US | 03 /
ZIMMEL, John, M. 1200 Willow Lake Boulevard, Box 64683 St. Paul, MN 55164-0683 / US | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00983835.0 | 01.12.2000 | [2002/37] | WO2000US32641 | Priority number, date | US19990453361 | 01.12.1999 Original published format: US 453361 | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0140343 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1237973 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1237973 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/40, C09J175/06 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
B29B7/726 (EP);
C08G18/4027 (EP,US);
C09J175/06 (EP,US);
C08G2170/20 (EP,US);
C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/307 (EP,US);
C09J175/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/31] |
Former [2002/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REAKTIVER HEISSSCHMELZKLEBSTOFF | [2002/37] | English: | IMPROVED REACTIVE HOT MELT ADHESIVE | [2002/37] | French: | ADHESIF THERMOFUSIBLE REACTIF AMELIORE | [2002/37] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 06.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5365333 ; | [A]US3767040 (TUSHAUS L) [A] 1* column 1, line 66 - column 4, line 19; example 8; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0420246 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * in particular page 3, line 22-24; page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 39 * * page 7, line 21 - line 24; claims 1,6 *; | [A]DE3933204 (JOWAT LOBERS U FRANK GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 21; example 1; claims 1,4 *; | [A] - "Undercoating agent for adhesive tape", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1978, no. 29, Database accession no. 1978-52262a, XP002162938 & JPS5365333 A 19780610 (HITACHI CHEM) [A] 1 * abstract * |