EP1237486 - REMOVABLE GASTRIC BAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Transneuronix, Inc. Suite 106, 100 Stierli Court Mt. Arlington, NJ 07856 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Transneuronix, Inc. Suite 106, 100 Stierli Court Mt. Arlington, NJ 07856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CIGAINA, Valerio Via 4 Novembre, 3/a I-31050 Villorba / IT | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00984025.7 | 07.12.2000 | [2002/37] | WO2000US33236 | Priority number, date | IT1999MI02641 | 07.12.1999 Original published format: IT MI992641 | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0141671 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1237486 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.03.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/08, A61B17/12 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
A61F5/0066 (EP);
A61F5/0026 (EP);
A61F5/0056 (EP);
A61B17/135 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/37] | A61B17/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABNEHMBARES MAGENBAND | [2002/37] | English: | REMOVABLE GASTRIC BAND | [2002/37] | French: | BANDE GASTRIQUE AMOVIBLE | [2002/37] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 10.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   06.03.2006 | 31.12.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8604498 (ASTRA MEDITEC AB [SE]) [A] 1-13* figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5152770 (BENGMARK STIG [SE], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 12 * * figure 2 *; | [X]EP0611561 (KUZMAK LUBOMYR IHOR [US]) [X] 1 * see the abstract * * column 5, line 22 - line 40 * * figures 2A,,2B,,4 *; | [XP]EP1036545 (MOSHE DUDAI [IL]) [XP] 1 * column 5, line 11 - line 28 * * figures 3A,3B * | International search | [A]US4592339 (KUZMAK LUBOMYR I [US], et al); | [A]US5074868 (KUZMAK LUBOMYR I [US]); | [X]US5152770 (BENGMARK STIG [SE], et al); | [X]US5449368 (KUZMAK LUBOMYR I [US]); | [A]US5938669 (KLAIBER CHRISTIAN [CH], et al); | [AP]US6102922 (JAKOBSSON ARNE [FR], et al) |