EP1268660 - LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE HAVING HIGH CHEMICAL RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kodak Polychrome Graphics Company Ltd. 401 Merritt 7 Norwalk, CT 06851 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states Kodak Polychrome Graphics Company Ltd. 401 Merritt 7 Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | ||
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states Kodak Polychrome Graphics Company Ltd. 401 Merrit 7 Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | ||
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Kodak Polychrome Graphics Company Ltd. 401 Merritt 7 Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMAZU, Ken-ichi 494 Chappaqua Road Briarcliff Manor, NY 19794 / US | 02 /
PATEL, Jayanti 55 Shaw Road Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07576 / US | 03 /
HUANG, Jianbing 1057 Daniels Farm Road Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US | 04 /
MERCANT, Nishith 1514 Ninethy-First Street North Bergon, NJ 07047 / US | 05 /
JAREK, Mathias Neustadt 57 37154 Northeim / DE | [2003/02] |
Former [2003/01] | 01 /
SHIMAZU, Ken-ichi 494 Chappaqua Road Briarcliff Manor, NY 19794 / US | ||
02 /
PATEL, Jayanti 55 Shaw Road Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07576 / US | |||
03 /
HUANG, Jianbing 201 Jay Street Woodridge, NJ 07075 / US | |||
04 /
MERCANT, Nishith 1514 Ninethy-First Street North Bergon, NJ 07047 / US | |||
05 /
JAREK, Mathias Neustadt 57 37154 Northeim / DE | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/01] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00984218.8 | 12.12.2000 | [2003/01] | WO2000US33603 | Priority number, date | US19990469493 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: US 469493 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0146318 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1268660 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1268660 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08L35/00, C08L33/20, B41N3/00, B41C1/10 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
B41C1/1016 (EP,US);
B41N3/00 (EP,US);
B41C2210/02 (EP,US);
B41C2210/06 (EP,US);
B41C2210/14 (EP,US);
B41C2210/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Title | German: | LITHOPRAPHISCHE DRUCKPLATTE MIT HOHEM CHEMISCHEN WIDERSTAND | [2003/01] | English: | LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE HAVING HIGH CHEMICAL RESISTANCE | [2003/01] | French: | PLANCHE D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE TRES RESISTANTE AUX AGENTS CHIMIQUES | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 08.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.2004 | BE | 28.07.2004 | CH | 28.07.2004 | CY | 28.07.2004 | FI | 28.07.2004 | LI | 28.07.2004 | TR | 28.07.2004 | DK | 28.10.2004 | GR | 28.10.2004 | SE | 28.10.2004 | IE | 13.12.2004 | PT | 28.12.2004 | LU | 31.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
BE | 28.07.2004 | ||
CH | 28.07.2004 | ||
CY | 28.07.2004 | ||
FI | 28.07.2004 | ||
LI | 28.07.2004 | ||
TR | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.12.2004 | ||
LU | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
BE | 28.07.2004 | ||
CH | 28.07.2004 | ||
FI | 28.07.2004 | ||
LI | 28.07.2004 | ||
TR | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
BE | 28.07.2004 | ||
CH | 28.07.2004 | ||
FI | 28.07.2004 | ||
LI | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
BE | 28.07.2004 | ||
CH | 28.07.2004 | ||
FI | 28.07.2004 | ||
LI | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
BE | 28.07.2004 | ||
CH | 28.07.2004 | ||
FI | 28.07.2004 | ||
LI | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
CH | 28.07.2004 | ||
FI | 28.07.2004 | ||
LI | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
CH | 28.07.2004 | ||
FI | 28.07.2004 | ||
LI | 28.07.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
FI | 28.07.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
FI | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 28.07.2004 | |
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 28.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6456755 ; | [A]JPS6456756 ; | [A]JPH07149819 ; | [A]EP0903225 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1-25 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * Table 1, polymer O;Table 5, samples 5,6 * * example - *; | [PA]EP0997272 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [PA] 1-25 * page 3, line 36 - page 4, line 48 * * example - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890613), vol. 013, no. 255, Database accession no. (C - 606), & JP01056755 A 19890303 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [A] 26-32 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890613), vol. 013, no. 255, Database accession no. (C - 606), & JP01056756 A 19890303 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [A] 26-32 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07149819 A 19950613 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO LTD) [A] 26-32 * abstract * |