EP1152741 - STABILIZED ANTIMICROBIAL SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 West Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | [2001/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAMPANI, Hanuman 401 Reading Circle Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 02 /
HOLLY, Thomas, F. 2410 Cypresswood Trl. 116 Arlington, TX 76014 / US | 03 /
NEWMAN, Jerry, L. 4112 Peachwood Drive Arlington, TX 76016 / US | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00984412.7 | 13.12.2000 | [2001/46] | WO2000US34008 | Priority number, date | US19990460012 | 13.12.1999 Original published format: US 460012 | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0141727 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1152741 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1152741 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/34, A61K8/27, A61K8/92, A61Q17/00, A61Q19/00 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
A61Q17/005 (EP);
A61K8/27 (EP);
A61K8/29 (EP);
A61K8/416 (EP);
A61K8/45 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/46] | A61K7/40, A61K7/48 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/22] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILISIERTE ANTIMIKROBIELLE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2001/46] | English: | STABILIZED ANTIMICROBIAL SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME | [2001/46] | French: | SYSTEMES ANTIMICROBIENS STABILISES ET PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION | [2001/46] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 19.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 08.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Request for further processing for: | 08.08.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 08.08.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.08.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9700667 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * page 35, line 29; examples 23,24; claims 1,3,6,8 *; | [X]WO9959540 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * example 18; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0769291 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * page 3, lines 35-43; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0640285 (SCHUELKE & MAYR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,6,7 * claim - * |