EP1226554 - POSTAL SYSTEM INTRANET AND COMMERCE PROCESSING FOR ON-LINE VALUE BEARING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stamps.Com Suite 1040, 3420 Ocean Park Boulevard Santa Monica, CA 90405 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Stamps.Com Suite 1040, 3420 Ocean Park Boulevard Santa Monica, CA 90405 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINGLE, Piers, Christian 11400 National Boulevard, No. 133 Los Angeles, CA 90064 / US | 02 /
KIYOHARA, Keith, Shoji 1223 Sunset Avenue Santa Monica, CA 90405 / US | 03 /
HWANG, Kenneth, Kay-Yih 3254 Inglewood Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US | 04 /
VENKAT, Girish Apt. 10, 10801 Rose Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US | [2002/33] |
Former [2002/31] | 01 /
LINGLE, Piers, Christian 11400 National Boulevard, No. 133 Los Angeles, CA 90064 / US | ||
02 /
KIYOHARA, Keith, Shoji 1233 Sunset Avenue Santa Monica, CA 90405 / US | |||
03 /
HWANG, Kenneth, Kay-Yih 3254 Inglewood Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US | |||
04 /
VENKAT, Girish Apt. 10, 10801 Rose Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US | Representative(s) | Müller, Wolfram Hubertus, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Müller, Wolfram Hubertus, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 00984553.8 | 18.10.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000US41291 | Priority number, date | US19990160036P | 18.10.1999 Original published format: US 160036 P | US19990160112P | 18.10.1999 Original published format: US 160112 P | US19990154523P | 19.10.1999 Original published format: US 154523 P | US19990160703P | 20.10.1999 Original published format: US 160703 P | US19990160491P | 20.10.1999 Original published format: US 160491 P | US19990160563P | 20.10.1999 Original published format: US 160563 P | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0145051 | Date: | 21.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1226554 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
G07B17/00733 (EP);
G07B17/0008 (EP);
G07B2017/00056 (EP);
G07B2017/00064 (EP);
G07B2017/00145 (EP);
G07B2017/00201 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTRANET FÜR EIN POSTSYSTEM UND KOMMERZIELLE DATENVERARBEITUNG FÜR EIN ONLINE WERTTRÄGERSYSTEM | [2002/31] | English: | POSTAL SYSTEM INTRANET AND COMMERCE PROCESSING FOR ON-LINE VALUE BEARING SYSTEM | [2002/31] | French: | INTRANET POUR SYSTEME POSTAL ET TRAITEMENT COMMERCIAL POUR SYSTEME A VALEUR AFFICHEE | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/36] | 02.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/36] | 20.04.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0927958 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [Y] 1-95 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO9918514 (CONTACT DYNAMICS INC [US]) [Y] 1-95 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9857302 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-95 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0927963 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-95 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0840258 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-95 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0948158 (FRANCOTYP POSTALIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-95 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US4802218 (WRIGHT CHRISTOPHER B [US], et al) [A] 1-95 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]US4935961 (GARGIULO JOSEPH L [US], et al) [A] 1-95 * figure 5; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9427258 (INTERACTIVE TELEVISION SYSTEMS [US], et al) [A] 1-95 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A] - USPS, "IBIP Postal Security Device Specification", USPS IBIP, (19960613), XP002137734 [A] 1-95 * the whole document * | by applicant | US163993 |