EP1226540 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING AND INVESTIGATING FRAUDULENT TRANSACTIONS IN DEBIT AND CHARGE CARD ACTIVATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Efunds Corporation 400 W. Deluxe Parkway Milwaukee, WI 53212 / US | [2002/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLAIG, Mark, S. W160 N10555 Old Farm Road Germantown, WI 53022 / US | 02 /
ODISHOO, George, J. N93 W5780 Dorchester Drive Cedarburg, WI 53012 / US | 03 /
SHEA, Gary, T. 811 East Wabash Place Bayside, WI 53217 / US | 04 /
WOJAK-PURANEN, Sally, A. W170 S8015 Green Street Muskego, WI 53150 / US | 05 /
CLARK, Robert, T. N5130 Country Lane Saukville, WI 53080 / US | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00984579.3 | 20.10.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000US41330 | Priority number, date | US19990161161P | 22.10.1999 Original published format: US 161161 P | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0131556 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1226540 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06K5/00, G06K19/06, G07F7/10 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G07F7/10 (EP,US);
G07F7/1083 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/31] | G06K5/00, G06K19/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2002/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG Z8UR ERKENNUNG UND UNTERSUCHUNG BETRÜGERISCHER HANDLUNGEN BEI AKTIVIERUNG VON GUTHABEN-KREITKARTEN | [2002/31] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING AND INVESTIGATING FRAUDULENT TRANSACTIONS IN DEBIT AND CHARGE CARD ACTIVATIONS | [2002/31] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION ET D'EXAMEN DE TRANSACTIONS FRAUDULEUSES PAR ACTIVATION DE CARTE DE DEBIT ET DE CREDIT | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/03] | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3731076 (NAGATA M, et al); | [Y]US4449040 (MATSUOKA AKIRA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-34 * abstract *; | [A]US4799255 (BILLINGER RANDY J [US], et al); | [A]US5777305 (SMITH M BROOKS [US], et al); | [Y]US5883452 (MASUDA HIDEHIRO [JP]) [Y] 1-34 * abstract * * column 5, line 31 - column 7, line 24 *; | [A]US5903633 (LORSCH ROBERT H [US]) [A] 1,3-6,9-13,17-19,21-23 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9933033 (VISA INT SERVICE ASS [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract * | International search | [YP]US6102162 (TEICHER MORDECHAI [IL]); | [YE]US6144948 (WALKER JAY S [US], et al) |