EP1232348 - PLANETARY GEAR FOR MOUNTING ON AN ELECTROMOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRSCHNER, Tino Mariabrunnstrasse 59 88097 Eriskirch / DE | [2002/34] | Application number, filing date | 00985073.6 | 21.11.2000 | [2002/34] | WO2000EP11582 | Priority number, date | DE1999156789 | 25.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19956789 | [2002/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0138759 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1232348 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1232348 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/02, H02K7/116 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
F16H57/025 (EP,KR,US);
F16H1/46 (KR);
F16H1/28 (EP,US);
F16H57/029 (EP,US);
H02K7/116 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLANETENGETRIEBE ZUM ANBAU AN EINEN ELEKTROMOTOR | [2002/34] | English: | PLANETARY GEAR FOR MOUNTING ON AN ELECTROMOTOR | [2002/34] | French: | ENGRENAGE PLANETAIRE A MONTER SUR UN MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE | [2002/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 07.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 05.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.01.2006 | FI | 18.01.2006 | IE | 18.01.2006 | NL | 18.01.2006 | TR | 18.01.2006 | GR | 19.04.2006 | PT | 19.06.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/38] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
TR | 18.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 18.01.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10112952 ; | [DA]DE19808184 (PFEFFER & PARTNER GETRIEBEBAU [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP1048877 (BONFIGLIOLI RIDUTTORI SPA [IT]) [PA] 1 * figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10112952 A 19980428 (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | EP0567048 | DE19647063 | by applicant | DE19808184 | DE19951613 |