EP1240673 - Method for raw etching silicon solar cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/38] | METHOD FOR RAW ETCHING SILICON SOLAR CELLS | ||
[2010/11] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜBELBECK, Armin Augartenstrasse 45 64625 Bensheim / DE | 02 /
Wiegand, Claudia Althelmweg 14 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
GÖLZENLEUCHTER, Thomas Fichtering 2 64572 Büttleborn / DE | [2002/45] |
Former [2002/43] | 01 /
KÜBELBECK, Armin Augartenstrasse 45 64625 Bensheim / DE | ||
02 /
Wiegand, Claudia Altheimweg 14 64291 Darmstadt / DE | |||
03 /
GÖLZENLEUCHTER, Thomas Fichtering 2 64572 Büttleborn / DE | |||
Former [2002/38] | 01 /
KÜBELBECK, Armin Augartenstrasse 45 64625 Bensheim / DE | ||
02 /
ZIELINSKI, Claudia Stormstrasse 15 64291 Darmstadt / DE | |||
03 /
GÖLZENLEUCHTER, Thomas Fichtering 2 64572 Büttleborn / DE | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 00985147.8 | 07.12.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000EP12328 | Priority number, date | DE19991062136 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19962136 | [2002/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0147032 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1240673 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1240673 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0236, H01L31/18, H01L21/306, H01L21/3213 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
H01L31/1804 (EP,US);
C09K13/06 (EP,US);
C09K13/08 (EP,US);
H01L31/02363 (EP,US);
Y02E10/547 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rauhätzung von Siliziumsolarzellen | [2010/11] | English: | Method for raw etching silicon solar cells | [2010/11] | French: | Procédé de gravure de cellules solaires au silicium pour les rendre rugueuses | [2010/11] |
Former [2002/38] | VERFAHREN ZUR RAUHÄTZUNG VON SILIZIUMSOLARZELLEN | ||
Former [2002/38] | METHOD FOR RAW ETCHING SILICON SOLAR CELLS | ||
Former [2002/38] | PROCEDE POUR RENDRE RUGUEUSES PAR ATTAQUE DES PILES SOLAIRES AU SILICIUM | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 23.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2011
09.02.2012
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED RENA GmbH Ob der Eck 5 78148 Gütenbach / DE Opponent's representative Stürken, Joachim Joachim Stürken Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Kirchenhölzle 18 79104 Freiburg / DE | [2012/11] |
Former [2011/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2011
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED RENA GmbH Ob der Eck 5 78148 Gütenbach / DE Opponent's representative Stürken, Joachim Joachim Stürken Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Kirchenhölzle 18 79104 Freiburg / DE | 11.11.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Opposition is deemed not to be filed 01 | 21.11.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular right | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | FI | 18.08.2010 | SE | 18.08.2010 | TR | 18.08.2010 | GR | 19.11.2010 | AT | 07.12.2010 | LU | 07.12.2010 | PT | 20.12.2010 | BE | 31.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | ES | 08.12.2011 | GB | 06.12.2020 | IE | 07.12.2020 | [2021/20] |
Former [2021/10] | CY | 18.08.2010 | |
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
TR | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
AT | 07.12.2010 | ||
LU | 07.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 08.12.2011 | ||
GB | 06.12.2020 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 18.08.2010 | |
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
TR | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
AT | 07.12.2010 | ||
LU | 07.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
ES | 08.12.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 18.08.2010 | |
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 18.08.2010 | |
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 18.08.2010 | |
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 18.08.2010 | |
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | FI | 18.08.2010 | |
PT | 20.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US3953263 (ISHIKAWA MISAO, et al) [AD] 1,4,6 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4137123 (BAILEY WILLIAM L, et al) [DA] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19746706 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,8,9 * page 4, line 53 - page 5, line 53; figures 1,8; example 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US5949123 (LE QUANG NAM [FR], et al); | [X] - R. EINHAUS ET AL., "Recent progress with acidic texturing solutions on different multicrystalline silicon materials including ribbons", 2ND WORLD CONFERENCE ON PHOTOVOLTAIC SOLAR ENERGY CONVERSION, VIENNA, AT, (19980706), vol. II, pages 1630 - 1633, XP002166724 [X] 1,6,8 * the whole document * | [X] - R. EINHAUS ET AL., "ISOTROPIC TEXTURING OF MULTICRYSTALLINE SILICON WAFERS WITH ACIDIC TEXTURING SOLUTIONS", 26TH IEEE PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE, ANAHEIM, CA, USA, (19970929), pages 167 - 170, XP002166725 [X] 1,6,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PVSC.1997.654055 | [X] - VERLINDEN P ET AL, "THE SURFACE TEXTURIZATION OF SOLAR CELLS: A NEW METHOD USING V-GROOVES WITH CONTROLLABLE SIDEWALL ANGLES", SOLAR ENERGY MATERIALS AND SOLAR CELLS,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, (19920301), vol. 26, no. 1 / 02, ISSN 0927-0248, pages 71 - 78, XP000264537 [X] 1,6,8,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0927-0248(92)90126-A |