EP1255610 - MICROFLUIDIC SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GYROS PATENT AB Uppsala Science Park 751 83 Uppsala / SE | [2005/42] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states Gyros AB Uppsala Science Park 751 83 Uppsala / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DERAND, Helene Enstavagen 33, Taby S-187 35 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
LARSSON, Anders Tapetserarvagen 14 S-167 72 Bromma / SE | 03 /
VAN ALSTINE, James Oddvar Odds vag 8, 2tr S-112 54 Stockholm / SE | [2002/46] | Application number, filing date | 00985154.4 | 11.12.2000 | [2002/46] | WO2000EP12478 | Priority number, date | SE19990004802 | 23.12.1999 Original published format: SE 9904802 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0147637 | Date: | 05.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1255610 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1255610 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
B01L3/502707 (EP,US);
B01L2200/12 (EP,US);
B01L2300/12 (EP,US);
B01L2300/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDISCHE OBERFLÄCHEN | [2002/46] | English: | MICROFLUIDIC SURFACES | [2002/46] | French: | SURFACES MICROFLUIDIQUES | [2002/46] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 28.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 29.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 31.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/09] | Request for further processing for: | 31.05.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 31.05.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.07.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2006 | BE | 15.03.2006 | CY | 15.03.2006 | FI | 15.03.2006 | TR | 15.03.2006 | DK | 15.06.2006 | GR | 16.06.2006 | PT | 16.08.2006 | IE | 11.12.2006 | LU | 11.12.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
TR | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 11.12.2006 | ||
LU | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 15.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0430248 (MOCHIDA PHARM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,8,11,12 * abstract * * page 9, line 49 - page 10, line 12 ** page 10, line 33 - page 10, line 41 *; | [DA]US5240994 (BRINK CARINA [SE], et al) [DA] 1-7,9,10 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5250613 (BERGSTROM KARIN [SE], et al) [DA] 1-7,9,10 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5858188 (SOANE DAVID S [US], et al) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XAY]DE19753847 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,11,12 * abstract * * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 60 * * column 9, line 50 - column 10, line 33 * [A] 5,6,8-10 [Y] 4; | [YDA]WO9958245 (AMERSHAM PHARM BIOTECH AB [SE], et al) [YD] 4 * abstract * * page 2, line 7 - page 5, line 30 * * page 7, line 11 - page 8, line 25 * * page 10, line 8 - page 11, line 23 * [A] 1-3,5-12; | [EA]EP1076239 (STUDIENGESELLSCHAFT KOHLE MBH [DE]) [E] 1-3,7,11,12 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 1, line 18 * * column 4, line 26 - column 4, line 49 * * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 4 * * column 6, line 33 - column 6, line 37 * [A] 4-6,8-10 |