EP1157381 - VARIABLE EQUALIZER CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEK, Aalbert Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
JANSEN, Theodorus, P., H., G. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 00985160.1 | 14.12.2000 | [2001/48] | WO2000EP12718 | Priority number, date | EP19990204401 | 20.12.1999 Original published format: EP 99204401 | [2001/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0146953 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1157381 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10 | [2001/48] | CPC: |
H04L25/03044 (EP,US);
G11B20/10046 (KR);
G11B20/10009 (EP,US);
G11B20/10037 (KR);
G11B20/10268 (KR);
G11B5/00813 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2001/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG EINES VARIABLEN ENTZERRERS | [2001/48] | English: | VARIABLE EQUALIZER CONTROL SYSTEM | [2001/48] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE D'UN EGALISATEUR VARIABLE | [2001/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 29.12.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0332079 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 58 * * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 35 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 9-11; | [XD]EP0387813 (SONY CORP [JP]) [XD] 1,2,4-8,12 * abstract * * page 3, line 54 - page 9, line 6 * * tables 1-3 * * figures 5-10 *; | [Y]EP0549030 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [Y] 9-11 * abstract * * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 22 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4243956 (LEMOUSSU MICHEL, et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5910936 (MARINO PHILIP F [US]) [A] 9-11 * abstract * * column 5 - column 7, line 20 * * figures 2,3 * |