EP1231893 - AJUGA TURKESTANICA EXTRACT AND ITS COSMETIC USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LVMH RECHERCHE 185 avenue de Verdun 45800 St. Jean de Braye / FR | [2004/40] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states LVMH RECHERCHE 20 avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dumas, Marc Apt. 61 61, Rce "Le Windsor" 47ter, avenue de la Mouillère 45100 Orleans / FR | 02 /
Bonte, Frédéric 54, rue Tudelle 45100 Orleans / FR | 03 /
Gondran, Catherine 7, allée des Mouettes 45730 St Benoit-sur-Loire / FR | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Giraud, Françoise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | Giraud, Françoise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00985316.9 | 24.11.2000 | [2002/34] | WO2000FR03274 | Priority number, date | FR19990014893 | 26.11.1999 Original published format: FR 9914893 | [2002/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0137799 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1231893 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1231893 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
A61Q17/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/63 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61Q1/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/34] | Title | German: | AJUGA TURKESTANIKA EXTRAKT UND SEINE KOSMETISCHE VERWENDUNG | [2002/34] | English: | AJUGA TURKESTANICA EXTRACT AND ITS COSMETIC USES | [2002/34] | French: | EXTRAIT D'AJUGA TURKESTANICA ET SES APPLICATIONS COSMETIQUES | [2002/34] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 23.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2004 | CY | 18.08.2004 | FI | 18.08.2004 | IE | 18.08.2004 | NL | 18.08.2004 | TR | 18.08.2004 | DK | 18.11.2004 | GR | 18.11.2004 | SE | 18.11.2004 | LU | 24.11.2004 | BE | 30.11.2004 | CH | 30.11.2004 | LI | 30.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | PT | 18.01.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CY | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
LU | 24.11.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/48] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 18.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3527777 (JIZBA JOSEF, et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0440494 (TOKIWA KANPO PHARMA [JP]) [A] 1-32 * claim - *; | [DA]WO9404132 (LVMH RECH [FR], et al) [DA] 1-32 * page 8, line 23 - line 34 * * example - * * page 10, line 2 - line 24 *; | [A] - A.U.MAMATKHANOV ET AL., "iSOLATION OF TURKESTERONE FROM THE EPIGEAL PART OF AJUGA TURKESTANICA AND IRS ANABOLIC ACTIVITY", CHEM. NAT. COMPD., (1998), vol. 34, no. 2, pages 150 - 154, XP000925904 [A] 1-20 * page 150 - page 151 * | [A] - KOTENKO, L.D.ET AL., "MONITORING OF TOTAL IRIDOID PRODUCTION BY AJUGA TURKESTANICA", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, XP002148031 [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - KHIM. PRIR. SOEDIN., (1994), vol. 6, pages 824 - 5 |