EP1238557 - SELECTION OF RADIOCOMMUNICATION NETWORKS FOR A MULTIMODE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states TDF 10, rue d'Oradour sur Glane 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states TDF 10, rue d'Oradour sur Glane 75015 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Télédiffusion de France 15, rue d'Oradour-sur-Glane 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALICOT, Jacques 15, rue Robelin F-35000 Rennes / FR | 02 /
ROLAND, Christian Le Petit Val F-35220 Saint Didier / FR | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Lapoux, Roland Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Lapoux, Roland Cabinet BLOCH & GEVERS 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/37] | Lapoux, Roland M. Cabinet Martinet & Lapoux, 43 Boulevard Vauban, B.P. 405, Guyancourt 78055 Saint Quentin Yvelines Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00985360.7 | 29.11.2000 | [2002/37] | WO2000FR03338 | Priority number, date | FR19990015927 | 14.12.1999 Original published format: FR 9915927 | [2002/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0145446 | Date: | 21.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1238557 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Title | German: | NETZWERK-AUSWAHLVERFAHREN FÜR EIN MULTIMODUSENDGERÄT | [2002/37] | English: | SELECTION OF RADIOCOMMUNICATION NETWORKS FOR A MULTIMODE TERMINAL | [2002/37] | French: | SELECTION DE RESEAUX DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION POUR UN TERMINAL MULTIMODE | [2002/37] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 01.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/31] | 14.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5974328 (LEE WILLIAM CHIEN-YEH ET AL) [X] 1-7,10 * column 1, line 32 - column 2, line 5 * * column 3, line 39 - line 50 * * column 6, line 40 - column 8, line 41 * [Y] 8,9; | [Y]GB2319438 (INT MARITIME SATELLITE ORGANIZ) [Y] 8 * page 13, line 19 - page 14, line 6; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5628055 (STEIN PER) [Y] 9 * column 2, line 37 - line 47; figure 13 * |