EP1227852 - BONE CEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/32] | KNOCHENZEMENT | ||
[2002/37] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hörmansdörfer, Gerd Kastanieneck 6 A D-31303 Burgdorf / DE | [2002/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖRMANSDÖRFER, Gerd Kastanieneck 6 A 31303 Burgdorf-Beinhorn / DE | 02 /
WESTERMANN, Kord Bahnhofstrasse 6 29342 Wienhausen / DE | [2002/32] | Application number, filing date | 00987230.0 | 10.11.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000EP11133 | Priority number, date | DE1999153975 | 10.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19953975 | [2002/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0134217 | Date: | 17.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1227852 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61L24/00, A61K49/04 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
A61L24/001 (EP);
A61L27/50 (EP);
A61L2430/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KNOCHENZEMENT | [2002/32] | English: | BONE CEMENT | [2002/37] | French: | CIMENT OSSEUX | [2002/32] |
Former [2002/32] | KNOCHENZEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.05.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 23.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/01] | 26.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5004501 (DE BASTIANI BASILIO M ET AL) [A] 1 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 54 *; | [A]US4268639 (POLZHOFER KURT ET AL) [A] 1 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 61 *; | [A]US5795922 (SHALABY SHALABY W ET AL); | [X]EP0734735 (KURARAY CO) [X] 12-18 * page 5, line 42 - line 45 * * page 10, line 38 - line 44 *; | [X]US4064566 (KNOELL ALBERT C ET AL) [X] 12-18 * column 1, line 39 - line 64 * * column 3, line 50 - line 55 *; | [X]EP0951893 (ROEKO GMBH & CO) [X] 19,20 * column 5, paragraph 29 * * claims 1,8 *; | [X]US5651956 (ADZAMLI KOFI ET AL) [X] 19,20 * column 3, line 19 - line 25 *; | [X]US5106301 (FUTAMI SHUNICHI ET AL) [X] 19,20 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 9 * * claims 1,3,8,16 * |