EP1259328 - FLOTATION MACHINE AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING FLOTATION EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Outokumpu Oyj Riihitontuntie 7 02200 Espoo / FI | [2002/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOMMARZ, Klaus 242 Cliffendale Dr., Faerie Glen Pretoria 0043 / ZA | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Zipse + Habersack Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00987510.5 | 13.12.2000 | [2002/48] | WO2000FI01090 | Priority number, date | FI19990002675 | 14.12.1999 Original published format: FI 992675 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0143881 | Date: | 21.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1259328 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B03D1/14, B03D1/16 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
B03B13/00 (EP,US);
B01F23/233641 (EP,US);
B01F23/2351 (EP,US);
B01F35/712 (EP,US);
B03D1/082 (EP,US);
B03D1/1493 (EP,US);
B03D1/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLOTATIONSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER FLOTATIONSWIRKUNG | [2002/48] | English: | FLOTATION MACHINE AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING FLOTATION EFFECT | [2002/48] | French: | MACHINE DE FLOTTATION ET PROCEDE DESTINE A AMELIORER L'EFFET DE FLOTTATION | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 01.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 17.08.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]SU1138192 ; | [Y]US5039400 (KALLIOINEN JOUKO O [FI], et al); | [A]US5472094 (SZYMOCHA KAZIMIERZ [CA], et al); | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 35, Database accession no. 1985-215869/35, XP002955458 & SU1138192 A 19850207 (KUZNT COAL ERRICHM) |