EP1241993 - ENDOLUMINAL OCCLUSION-IRRIGATION CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/39] | ENDOLUMINAL OCCLUSION-IRRIGATION CATHETER AND METHODS OF USE | ||
[2006/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre Bush Hill Bay Street St. Michael / BB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael / BB | ||
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANG, Yue-Teh 43659 Syke Road Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 02 /
TSUGITA, Ross 1653 Gretel Lane Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 03 /
ADDIS, Bruce 905 Emerald Hill Road Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 04 /
MAAHS, Tracy 1610 Nantucket Circle 213 Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 05 /
CHANG, Jean 320 Manzanita Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/39] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00988275.4 | 22.12.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000US34941 | Priority number, date | US19990470026 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: US 470026 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0145572 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1241993 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1241993 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22, A61M25/00, A61M1/00 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
A61B17/22 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22067 (EP,US);
A61B2217/005 (EP,US);
A61B2217/007 (EP,US);
A61M2206/16 (EP,US);
A61M25/007 (EP,US);
A61M25/1011 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Title | German: | ENDOLUMINALER OKKLUSIONS-SPÜLKATHETER | [2006/25] | English: | ENDOLUMINAL OCCLUSION-IRRIGATION CATHETER | [2006/25] | French: | CATHETER POUR OCCLUSION ET IRRIGATION ENDOLUMINALE | [2006/25] |
Former [2002/39] | ENDOLUMINALER OKKLUSIONS-SPÜLKATHETER UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANWENDUNG | ||
Former [2002/39] | ENDOLUMINAL OCCLUSION-IRRIGATION CATHETER AND METHODS OF USE | ||
Former [2002/39] | CATHETER POUR OCCLUSION ET IRRIGATION ENDOLUMINALE, ET MODE D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 25.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.05.2006 | 18.05.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.03.2007 | CH | 28.03.2007 | CY | 28.03.2007 | DK | 28.03.2007 | FI | 28.03.2007 | LI | 28.03.2007 | TR | 28.03.2007 | SE | 28.06.2007 | GR | 29.06.2007 | PT | 28.08.2007 | LU | 22.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
CY | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
LU | 22.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
CY | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 28.03.2007 | |
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 28.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5462529 (SIMPSON JOHN B [US], et al) [A] 1,30* abstract *; | [A]US5536242 (WILLARD KEVIN C [US], et al) [A] 4,7 * abstract *; | [A]US5634897 (DANCE CREG W [US], et al) [A] 4,7 * figures 1,14 *; | [X]US5833644 (ZADNO-AZIZI GHOLAM-REZA [US], et al) [X] 1-10,30-35 * abstract * * column 10, line 11 - column 11, line 18 * * column 12, line 11 - line 29 * * column 15, line 35 - line 56; figures 6,7,18F * | by applicant | US5423742 | US5833650 |