EP1242956 - FACILITATING A TRANSACTION BETWEEN A MERCHANT AND A BUYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. World Headquarters, One Elmcroft Road Stamford, Connecticut 06926-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOTH, Thomas, J. 5099 Madison Avenue Trumbull, CT 06611 / US | 02 /
ROMANSKY, Brian, M. 51 Greenwood Drive Monroe, CT 06468 / US | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00988327.3 | 20.12.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000US35175 | Priority number, date | US19990474326 | 29.12.1999 Original published format: US 474326 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0148662 | Date: | 05.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1242956 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.07.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, G06F1/00 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3678 (EP,US);
G06Q20/382 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/39] | G06F17/60 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2002/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERLEICHTERN EINER TRANSLATION ZWISCHEN EINEM VERKÄUFER UND EINEM KÄUFER | [2002/39] | English: | FACILITATING A TRANSACTION BETWEEN A MERCHANT AND A BUYER | [2002/39] | French: | FACILITATION DE TRANSACTIONS ENTRE COMMER ANT ET ACHETEUR | [2002/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 24.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2003 | 31.12.2014 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5509070 (SCHULL JONATHAN [US]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - line 15 * * column 2, line 33 - line 37 * * column 5, line 19 - line 58 * * column 6, line 40 - line 44 * * column 7, line 37 - line 42 * * column 9, line 57 - line 65 * * column 10, line 12 - line 64 * * column 14, line 19 - line 67 * * column 15, line 65 - column 16, line 4 *; | [X]EP0798892 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - line 49 * * column 4, line 34 - line 51 * * column 5, line 55 - column 7, line 25 * * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 9 * * column 8, line 30 - line 47 * * column 9, line 57 - column 10, line 12 * * column 10, line 23 - column 11, line 2 * * column 11, line 27 - line 58 * * column 12, line 32 - line 56 * * column 13, line 18 - column 15, line 3 * * column 16, line 28 - line 59 *; | [X]US5845281 (BENSON GREG [SE], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 33 - line 60 * * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 27 * * column 5, line 47 - line 64 * * column 7, line 1 - column 10, line 22 * * column 12, line 29 - column 14, line 18 * * column 17, line 24 - line 27 *; | [X]US5933498 (SCHNECK PAUL B [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 9 * * column 3, line 37 - line 44 * * column 7, line 28 - line 43 * * column 9, line 42 - column 10, line 58 * * column 11, line 44 - column 13, line 9 * * column 15, line 1 - line 18 * * column 17, line 44 - line 53 * * column 21, line 10 - line 19 * * column 22, line 43 - line 50 * * column 23, line 42 - line 48 * * column 25, line 49 - line 63 * * column 29, line 37 - line 57 * * column 33, line 1 - column 34, line 3 *; | [E]US6473740 (COCKRILL MICHAEL P [US], et al) [E] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A] - TODD WOODY, "Fight for your rights", THE STANDARD (INTERNET), (19990607), URL: http://thestandard.com/article/display/0,1151,4793,00.html, (20001116), XP002153035 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - CHOUDHURY A K ET AL, "COPYRIGHT PROTECTION FOR ELECTRONIC PUBLISHING OVER COMPUTER NETWORKS", IEEE NETWORK, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19950501), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 0890-8044, pages 12 - 20, XP000505280 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.386048 | [A] - BAKER, "In the money - QPass has big hopes for small Net sales", BUSINESS JOURNAL (INTERNET), (19981012), URL: www.amcity.com/seattle/stories/1998/10/12/story3.html, (20000330), XP002134402 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5590197 (CHEN JAMES F [US], et al); | [A]US5855008 (GOLDHABER A NATHANIEL [US], et al); | [A]US5883810 (FRANKLIN D CHASE [US], et al); | [A]US5956400 (CHAUM DAVID [US], et al); | [AP]US6005939 (FORTENBERRY KEITH NEIL [US], et al); | [AP]US6055518 (FRANKLIN MATTHEW K [US], et al); | [AP]US6078902 (SCHENKLER LEON [IL]) |