EP1232561 - METHOD FOR STARTING A SENSOR- AND BRUSHLESS D.C. MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/40] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAUTH, Wolfgang Römerstrasse 22 77855 Achern-Sasbachried / DE | 02 /
SCHWENK, Wolfgang 38000 Hills Tech Drive Farmington Hills, MI 48331 / US | [2002/34] | Application number, filing date | 00988615.1 | 15.11.2000 | [2002/34] | WO2000DE04026 | Priority number, date | DE1999155247 | 17.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19955247 | [2002/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0137420 | Date: | 25.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1232561 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1232561 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/22 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
H02P6/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2002/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANFAHREN EINES SENSOR- UND BÜRSTENLOSEN GLEICHSTROMMOTORS | [2002/34] | English: | METHOD FOR STARTING A SENSOR- AND BRUSHLESS D.C. MOTOR | [2002/34] | French: | PROCEDE DE DEMARRAGE D'UN MOTEUR A COURANT CONTINU SANS DETECTEUR NI BALAI | [2002/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 07.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2590423 (VALEO [FR]) [X] 1,2,6,7,10 * abstract * * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 14 * * page 5, line 34 - page 7, line 21 * * page 10, line 22 - page 15, line 11; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US5198733 (WRIGHT LAURENCE M [GB]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * column A * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 38 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 66; figure 1 *; | [A]US5466999 (HUTSELL LARRY [US]) [A] 1,2 * column A * * column 2, lines 5-53 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 55 * * column 6, lines 20-43; figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [A]JPH01308192 ; | [A]US5350984 (CAROBOLANTE FRANCESCO [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column A * * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 44 * * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 2; figures 1-4 *; | [A]JPH11243698 ; | [PX]JP2000104981 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900227), vol. 14, no. 108, Database accession no. (E - 896), & JP01308192 A 19891212 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11243698 A 19990907 (MATSUSHITA SEIKO CO LTD) [A] 3-5,8 * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000929), vol. 2000, no. 7, & JP2000104981 A 20000411 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [PX] 1,3-5,10 * abstract * |