EP1152911 - MOTOR VEHICLE AIR-CONDITIONING SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR OPERATING A MOTOR VEHICLE AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2001/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESSE, Ullrich Trollinger Strasse 3 71563 Affalterbach / DE | 02 /
TIEDEMANN, Thomas Friedrich-Engels-Strasse 28 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2001/46] | Application number, filing date | 00988655.7 | 25.11.2000 | [2001/46] | WO2000DE04190 | Priority number, date | DE1999159439 | 09.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19959439 | [2001/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0142035 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1152911 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1152911 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/32, F25B9/00, F25B9/06 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
B60H1/3204 (EP,US);
B60H1/32 (KR);
B60H1/3229 (EP,US);
F25B1/10 (EP,US);
F25B11/02 (EP,US);
F25B9/008 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/24] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER KLIMAANLAGE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [2001/46] | English: | MOTOR VEHICLE AIR-CONDITIONING SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR OPERATING A MOTOR VEHICLE AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM | [2001/46] | French: | SYSTEME DE CLIMATISATION POUR VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES ET PROCEDE POUR L'EXPLOITATION D'UN SYSTEME DE CLIMATISATION POUR VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES | [2001/46] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/07] | 10.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 11.06.2003 | [2004/22] | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2636024 (MEYER HANS); | [X]EP0248296 (ENERGIAGAZDALKODASI INTEZET [HU]) [X] 1,11 * column 11, line 44 - line 46; figure 7 *; | [Y]DE4315924 (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM FUER KAELTET [DE]) [Y] 2 * column 3, line 43 - line 53 *; | [XY]DE19802613 (FKW HANNOVER FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM [DE]) [X] 1,3-13 * page 1, line 5 - line 7 * * page 3, line 23 - line 46; figure 3 * [Y] 2 |