EP1263909 - POLYPROPYLENE-BASED ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2009 | Deletion: Date of oral proceedings | 07.02.2009 | New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARANDINOS, A.G. Dorsershof 27b B-1932 St-Stevens-Woluwe / BE | 02 /
LOHSE, D., J. 556 Stoney Brook Drive Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 03 /
GEORJON, Olivier, J., F. 21 Avenue Crokaert B-1150 Brussels / BE | 04 /
LEWTAS, Kenneth Sterrebecklaan 79 B-3080 Tervuren / BE | 05 /
TANCREDE, Jean, M. 936 Shadybrook Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70816-1287 / US | 06 /
HARRINGTON, Bruce, A. 14239 Oak Chase Drive Houston, TX 77062 / US | 07 /
NELSON, Keith, A. 12332 Lake La Belle Circle Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US | 08 /
DATTA, Sudhin 2203 Driscoll Street Houston, TX 77019-6826 / US | 09 /
COZEWITH, Charles 4810 Welford Drive Bellaire, TX 77401 / US | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Dörries, Hans Ulrich, Dr. Dörries, Frank-Molnia & Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00989420.5 | 21.12.2000 | [2002/50] | WO2000US35000 | Priority number, date | US19990171715P | 22.12.1999 Original published format: US 171715 P | US20000199093P | 21.04.2000 Original published format: US 199093 P | [2002/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0146277 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1263909 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09J123/14, C08F210/16 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
C09J123/10 (EP,US);
C09J123/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08F210/06 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L2314/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09J123/10, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C09J123/14, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C09J123/14, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08F210/06, C08F210/14, C08F2500/17 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYPROPYLEN KLEBSTOFFE | [2002/50] | English: | POLYPROPYLENE-BASED ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS | [2002/50] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ADHESIVES A BASE DE POLYPROPYLENE | [2002/50] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 02.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 13.10.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.01.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/11] | Appeal following examination | 07.12.2006 | Appeal received No. T0812/07 | 23.02.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.01.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | 17.02.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP09151336.6 / EP2045304 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9510575 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-25,27,28,30-35,41-44,48-50 * page 5, line 9 - page 8, line 14; examples 1,2 * [Y] 46,47; | [XY]EP0716121 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-19,21,23,28,29,31-33,36-40 * example 3 * [Y] 46,47; | [X]EP0870794 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [X] 1-19,21,23,28,29,31-33 * example 1 *; | [X]WO9920664 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 21,23,28-32* page 7, lines 6-12; examples 8,20; table 6 *; | [PX]WO0001745 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [PX] 1-11,14-18 * page 3, line 22 - page 13, line 27 * |