EP1247195 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INSTRUCTION LEVEL MULTITHREADING IN AN EMBEDDED PROCESSOR USING ZERO-TIME CONTEXT SWITCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ubicom, Inc. 635 Clyde Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2002/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELSEY, Nicholas, J. 1446 Isabelle Avenue Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 02 /
WATERS, Christopher, J., F. 1170 University Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 03 /
MIMAROGLU, Tibet 1040 Gloucester Court Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 04 /
FOTLAND, David, Allan 4863 Capistrano Avenue San Jose, CA 95129 / US | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00989474.2 | 21.12.2000 | [2002/41] | WO2000US35242 | Priority number, date | US19990171731P | 22.12.1999 Original published format: US 171731 P | US20000213745P | 22.06.2000 Original published format: US 213745 P | US20000250781P | 01.12.2000 Original published format: US 250781 P | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0146827 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1247195 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.06.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38, G06F9/46 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
G06F9/4881 (EP,US);
G06F1/324 (EP,US);
G06F1/3275 (EP,US);
G06F9/3851 (EP,US);
G06F9/3861 (EP,US);
G06F9/461 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/41] | G06F15/78, G06F9/40, G06F9/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUF BEFEHLSEBENE ARBEITENDEN MULTITHREADING IN EINEM EINGEBETTETEN PROZESSOR MIT NULLZEITKONTEXTUMSCHALTUNG | [2002/41] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INSTRUCTION LEVEL MULTITHREADING IN AN EMBEDDED PROCESSOR USING ZERO-TIME CONTEXT SWITCHING | [2002/41] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT MULTIFILIERE AU NIVEAU DES INSTRUCTIONS DANS UN PROCESSEUR INTEGRE AU MOYEN D'UNE COMMUTATION D'ENVIRONNEMENT DE TEMPS ZERO | [2002/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2002 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 22.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/47] | 07.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.01.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5524250 (CHESSON GREG [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 40 - column 2, line 57 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 2 * * column 9, line 35 - column 10, line 54 *; | [X]US5727211 (GULSEN DENIS [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 11 * * column 2, line L - column 3, line 33 *; | [X]US5515538 (KLEIMAN STEVEN R [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 47 - line 50 * * column 2, line 15 - line 31 * * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 11 *; | [X]WO9954813 (TRANSWITCH CORP [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 1, paragraph L - page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph L - page 3, paragraph 1 * | [X] - WATHEQ EL-KHARASHI M ET AL, "Multithreaded processors: the upcoming generation for multimedia chips", ADVANCES IN DIGITAL FILTERING AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1998 IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON VICTORIA, BC, CANADA 5-6 JUNE 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980605), ISBN 0-7803-4957-1, pages 111 - 115, XP010289025 [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [03.1] , [03.3] , [04.2] , [0006] * | International search | [Y]US5867725 (FUNG PATRICK WAI-WAH [US], et al); | [Y]US5944816 (DUTTON DREW J [US], et al); | [A]US4821187 (UEDA HIROTADA [JP], et al); | [A]US5410658 (SAWASE TERUMI [JP], et al) | [X] - M.D. NEMIROVSKY, "DISC: Dynamic instruction stream computer", ACM, (1991), pages 163 - 170, XP002940202 |