EP1247201 - A METHOD FOR MANAGING A UTILITY SERVICE UTILIZING A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accenture LLP 1661 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2002/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLCOMBE, Bradford 16143 Carden Drive Odessa, FL 33556 / US | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/41] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00989479.1 | 22.12.2000 | [2002/41] | WO2000US35256 | Priority number, date | US19990471644 | 23.12.1999 Original published format: US 471644 | US19990471961 | 23.12.1999 Original published format: US 471961 | US19990472717 | 23.12.1999 Original published format: US 472717 | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0146845 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1247201 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP);
G01R22/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERWALTEN EINES VERSORGUNGSDIENSTES MIT HILFE EINES NETZWERKS | [2002/41] | English: | A METHOD FOR MANAGING A UTILITY SERVICE UTILIZING A NETWORK | [2002/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE GESTION D'UN SERVICE UTILITAIRE AU MOYEN D'UN RESEAU | [2002/41] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 14.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.12.2007 | 19.11.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/16] | 03.12.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/16] | 06.12.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.12.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   08.03.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | Examination | EP0893775 | EP0834818 | EP0834819 | US5897607 | EP0795948 | US5943656 | WO9738385 | US4956825 | WO9931612 | US5905975 |