EP1276581 - CUTTING PROFILE TOOL FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SPIRAL AND HYPOID BEVEL GEARS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | Refusal of application | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SICKLINGER, Josef Witzingerreuterstrasse 52 94124 Büchlberg / DE | [2003/04] | Application number, filing date | 00989925.3 | 30.11.2000 | [2003/04] | WO2000EP12013 | Priority number, date | DE1999158675 | 06.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19958675 | [2003/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0141960 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1276581 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23F1/00 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
B23F21/023 (EP,US);
B23F21/02 (EP,US);
B23F21/14 (EP,US);
B23F21/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [2004/20] |
Former [2003/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | SPANABHEBENDES PROFILWERKZEUG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SPIRAL- UND HYPOIDKEGELRÄDERN | [2003/04] | English: | CUTTING PROFILE TOOL FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SPIRAL AND HYPOID BEVEL GEARS | [2003/04] | French: | OUTIL DE COUPE PROFILE POUR LA PRODUCTION DE PIGNONS CONIQUES SPIRAUX OU "HYPOID" | [2003/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.03.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 12.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/45] | 11.06.2004 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1098332 (JIN INOUE) [A] 1 * column 1, line 40 - column 3, line 11 * * figure - *; | [A]GB1028800 (ZAHNSCHNEIDEMASCHINENFAB MODUL) [A] 1 * page 1, line 10 - line 24 * * page 2, line 9 - line 16 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4260299 (RYAN ARTHUR B, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 16 - line 24 * * figure 5 *; | [A]DE4305409 (IBH BERNHARD HILPERT INGENIEUR [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US5374142 (MASSETH JOHN E [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 2 - line 5 * * figure - *; | [A]DE4420225 (NILES WERKZEUGMASCH GMBH [DE]); | [A]US5624301 (LENZ SIEGHART [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 54 * * figure 4 *; | [DA] - HOEHNKE M ET AL, "KOMPLEXE PROFILE DOPPELKEGELFOERMIGER SCHLEIFKOERPER FUER ZAHN- FLANKEN NUMERISCH GESTEUERT ABRICHTEN", WERKSTATT UND BETRIEB,DE,CARL HANSER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, (19910801), vol. 124, no. 8, ISSN 0043-2792, pages 661 - 663, XP000243308 [DA] * page 8 * |