EP1244579 - INFLATABLE RESTRAINT ASSEMBLY FOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Z/C Holding Company 201 S. Biscayne Boulevard, 34th floor Miami, FL 33131 / US | [2002/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUMPANO, Bernard, J. 9971 S.W. 128th Street Miami, FL 33176 / US | [2002/40] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | Wilson Gunn M'Caw 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00990323.8 | 22.12.2000 | [2002/40] | WO2000US35143 | Priority number, date | US19990470922 | 23.12.1999 Original published format: US 470922 | [2002/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0145987 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1244579 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.06.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/22, B60R21/24, B60R21/26, B60R21/16, B60R21/01 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
B60R21/233 (EP,US);
B60N2/286 (EP,US);
B60N2/2884 (EP,US);
B60R21/01508 (EP,US);
B60R21/01516 (EP,US);
B60R21/18 (EP,US);
B60R21/2072 (EP,US);
B60R21/232 (EP,US);
B60R2021/0004 (EP,US);
B60R2021/0006 (EP,US);
B60R2021/0011 (EP,US);
B60R2021/01211 (EP,US);
B60R2021/2074 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23107 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23324 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/40] | B60R21/22, B60R21/24, B60R21/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFBLASBARE RÜCKHALTEANORDNUNGEN FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [2002/40] | English: | INFLATABLE RESTRAINT ASSEMBLY FOR VEHICLES | [2002/40] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE COUSSINS GONFLABLES POUR VEHICULES | [2002/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.07.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 30.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/04] | 12.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.02.2003 | 31.12.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.2006 | 31.12.2008 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   07.05.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4041049 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 30 - column 5, line 53; figure -; claims 6,7 *; | [X]EP0965500 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0026]; figure - *; | [X]GB2303479 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 1; figure - * | International search | [A]US3802719 (BROWN R); | [A]US5707078 (SWANBERG JEFFREY SCOTT [US], et al); | [A]US5842718 (BYON SUNG-KWANG [KR]); | [A]US5927753 (FAIGLE ERNST M [US], et al); | [A]US5947514 (KELLER GERALD [US], et al) |