EP1240542 - EYEGLASS LENS WITH MULTIPLE OPTICAL ZONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PeakVision Sports, LLC 9153 W. 133rd Street Overland Park, KS 66213 / US | [2007/34] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Peakvision, LLC P.O. Box 902366 Needham, MA 02492 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERNS, David, V., Jr. 145 Black Bear Drive, 2021 Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 02 /
MOORE, J., Paul 12704 Linden Leawood, KS 66209 / US | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Strachan, Victoria Jane, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Strachan, Victoria Jane, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Alexandra House, 1 Alexandra Road Swansea SA1 5ED / GB | Application number, filing date | 00990447.5 | 26.10.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000US41615 | Priority number, date | US19990469916 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: US 469916 | [2002/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0146747 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1240542 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.06.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/10, G02C5/00 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
G02C7/104 (EP,US);
G02C7/105 (EP,US);
G02C7/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/38] | G02C7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRILLENLINSE MIT MEHREREN OPTISCHEN ZONEN | [2002/38] | English: | EYEGLASS LENS WITH MULTIPLE OPTICAL ZONES | [2002/38] | French: | VERRE DE LUNETTES COMPORTANT DE MULTIPLES ZONES OPTIQUES | [2002/38] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2002 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/50] | 28.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]EP0992832 (INTERCAST EUROP SPA [IT]) [PA] 1-15,21-30 * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 19 * * column 4, line 17 - column 5, line 18 * * column 8, line 42 - column 9, line 50 *; | [A]US5355182 (BARBERA UMBERTO [IT]) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 24 *; | [A]US5432568 (BETZ ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 1-7,12-18 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 17 * * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 31 * * column 10, line 64 - column 11, line 33 *; | [A]US5363152 (REED III CLURIN B [US]) [A] 1-7,12-15 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 27 *; | [A]US1950925 (EDWIN JONES ALFRED) [A] 1-11 * page 1 - page 2, line 9 *; | [A]US2009700 (MCMURDO HEW B) [A] 1,8,10 * page 2, column LEFT, lines 5-35 * | International search | [X]US4537479 (SHINOHARA TOSHIHIDE [JP], et al); | [X]US5975695 (BAIOCCHI PAOLO [IT], et al); | [X]US5252997 (CHRISTENBERY CHARLES R [US]); | [X]US4915495 (TAKEUCHI KUNIO [JP]) |