EP1240705 - DEVICE FOR IMPREGNATING THE INSULATION OF A WINDING ROD OF AN ELECTRICAL MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Alstom Power Generation AG Boveristrasse 22 68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEE, Peter Ludwigsdorf 37 69483 Waldmichelbach / DE | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Dimper, Dieter, et al ALSTOM Technology Ltd CHTI Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5401 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | Dimper, Dieter, et al c/o Alstom (Switzerland) Ltd CHSP Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Str. 7/699/5 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2002/38] | Hellwig, Tillmann, Dr. Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte, Postfach 103762 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00990730.4 | 13.12.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000EP12630 | Priority number, date | DE1999162290 | 23.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19962290 | [2002/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0148898 | Date: | 05.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1240705 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1240705 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/12 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
H02K15/12 (EP,US);
H02K3/32 (KR);
H01F41/127 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2002/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUM IMPRÄGNIEREN EINER ISOLATION EINES WICKLUNGSSTABES EINER ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINE | [2002/38] | English: | DEVICE FOR IMPREGNATING THE INSULATION OF A WINDING ROD OF AN ELECTRICAL MACHINE | [2002/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR IMPREGNER L'ISOLATION D'UNE DEMI-BOBINE D'UNE MACHINE ELECTRIQUE | [2002/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 05.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08157729.8 / EP1959545 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS5713728 ; | [A]JPH06153466 ; | [A]JPH06141521 ; | [X]JPS61214750 ; | [A]JPS61220814 ; | [A]RU1819367 ; | [A]DE3138766 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * page 8, line 1 - page 9, paragraph 1; figure 2 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820507), vol. 6, no. 72, Database accession no. (E - 105), & JP57013728 A 19820123 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940905), vol. 18, no. 475, Database accession no. (E - 1601), & JP06153466 A 19940531 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940824), vol. 18, no. 455, Database accession no. (E - 1595), & JP06141521 A 19940520 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870220), vol. 11, no. 55, Database accession no. (E - 481), & JP61214750 A 19860924 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870226), vol. 11, no. 64, Database accession no. (M - 565), & JP61220814 A 19861001 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 8 * abstract * | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, 5, Derwent World Patents Index, (19941207), vol. 94, no. 42, Database accession no. 94-339532, XP002166811 & SU1819367 A 19930530 (TSIBIZOV VICTOR V) [A] 8 * abstract * * figure 1 * |