EP1186114 - MULTIPLE MASK ARRANGEMENT FOR JUMPING IN PSEUDO-NOISE SEQUENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREENHOE, Daniel, J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | White, Andrew Gordon, et al NXP Semiconductors UK Ltd Betchworth House Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | White, Andrew Gordon, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2002/11] | Volmer, Georg Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52066 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00991803.8 | 22.12.2000 | [2002/11] | WO2000EP13204 | Priority number, date | US19990474302 | 29.12.1999 Original published format: US 474302 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0150621 | Date: | 12.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1186114 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H03K3/84 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2002/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | MEHRFACHMASKENANORDNING ZUM SPRINGEN IN PSEUDOZUFALLSFOLGEN | [2002/11] | English: | MULTIPLE MASK ARRANGEMENT FOR JUMPING IN PSEUDO-NOISE SEQUENCES | [2002/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF A PLUSIEURS MASQUES DESTINE A INSERER DES SAUTS DANS DES SEQUENCES A BRUIT PSEUDO-ALEATOIRE | [2002/11] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 04.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.03.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5835488 (SUGITA TAKEHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,6,7 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 3 * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 65; figure 2 * * column 6, line 36 - column 7, line 22; figure 7 * * column 8, line 2 - line 51; figure 9 * * column 9, line 30 - column 10, line 40; claims 1-11 *; | [DA]WO9945670 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1,6,7* page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 27; claims 1-14 * |