EP1161839 - SNR SCALABLE VIDEO ENCODING METHOD AND CORRESPONDING DECODING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOTTREAU, Vincent Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BENETIERE, Marion Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
PESQUET-POPESCU, Beatrice Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Landousy, Christian Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, 156 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [2010/02] |
Former [2001/50] | Landousy, Christian Philips Corporate Intellectual Property, 156 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00991804.6 | 22.12.2000 | [2001/50] | WO2000EP13206 | Priority number, date | EP19990403308 | 28.12.1999 Original published format: EP 99403308 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0149036 | Date: | 05.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1161839 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
H04N19/29 (EP,US);
H04N19/30 (KR);
H04N19/36 (EP,US);
H04N19/53 (EP,US);
H04N19/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIDEOKODIERUNG MIT SKALIERBAREM SIGNAL-RAUSCHABSTAND | [2001/50] | English: | SNR SCALABLE VIDEO ENCODING METHOD AND CORRESPONDING DECODING METHOD | [2001/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE CODAGE VIDEO A RAPPORT SIGNAL-BRUIT ECHELONNABLE ET PROCEDE DE DECODAGE CORRESPONDANT | [2001/50] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 25.09.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD] - MALLAT S G ET AL, "Matching pursuits with time-frequency dictionaries", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, DEC. 1993, USA, vol. 41, no. 12, ISSN 1053-587X, pages 3397 - 3415, XP002164631 [AD] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.258082 | [A] - LECHAT P ET AL, "SCALABLE IMAGE CODING WITH FINE GRANULARITY BASED ON HIERARCHICAL MESH", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE CONFERENCE ON VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING '99, SAN JOSE, CALIFORNIA, US, (199901), pages 1130 - 1142, XP000862993 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * |