EP1254036 - METHOD FOR FOLDING IN/OUT AN ELECTRICALLY ACTUATED TOW HITCH AND ELECTRICALLY ACTUATED TOW HITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURNUS, Oliver Dorfstrasse 8 29393 Gross Oesingen / DE | [2002/45] | Application number, filing date | 00991808.7 | 22.12.2000 | [2002/45] | WO2000EP13246 | Priority number, date | DE2000103607 | 28.01.2000 Original published format: DE 10003607 | [2002/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0154931 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1254036 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1254036 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60D1/52 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
B60D1/246 (EP);
B60D1/54 (EP);
B60T2201/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EIN-/AUSKLAPPEN EINER ELEKTRISCH BETRIEBENEN ANHÄNGERKUPPLUNG UND ELEKTRISCH BETRIEBENE ANHÄNGERKUPPLUNG | [2002/45] | English: | METHOD FOR FOLDING IN/OUT AN ELECTRICALLY ACTUATED TOW HITCH AND ELECTRICALLY ACTUATED TOW HITCH | [2002/45] | French: | PROCEDE POUR RENTRER ET SORTIR UN DISPOSITIF D'ATTELAGE ELECTRIQUE, ET DISPOSITIF D'ATTELAGE ELECTRIQUE | [2002/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 22.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 16.02.2005 | FR | 16.02.2005 | GB | 16.02.2005 | IE | 16.02.2005 | IT | 16.02.2005 | NL | 16.02.2005 | TR | 16.02.2005 | DK | 16.05.2005 | GR | 16.05.2005 | SE | 16.05.2005 | ES | 27.05.2005 | PT | 04.08.2005 | [2007/35] |
Former [2006/51] | FI | 16.02.2005 | |
FR | 16.02.2005 | ||
GB | 16.02.2005 | ||
IE | 16.02.2005 | ||
NL | 16.02.2005 | ||
TR | 16.02.2005 | ||
DK | 16.05.2005 | ||
GR | 16.05.2005 | ||
SE | 16.05.2005 | ||
ES | 27.05.2005 | ||
PT | 04.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | FI | 16.02.2005 | |
FR | 16.02.2005 | ||
GB | 16.02.2005 | ||
IE | 16.02.2005 | ||
NL | 16.02.2005 | ||
DK | 16.05.2005 | ||
GR | 16.05.2005 | ||
SE | 16.05.2005 | ||
ES | 27.05.2005 | ||
PT | 04.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 16.02.2005 | |
GB | 16.02.2005 | ||
IE | 16.02.2005 | ||
NL | 16.02.2005 | ||
DK | 16.05.2005 | ||
GR | 16.05.2005 | ||
SE | 16.05.2005 | ||
ES | 27.05.2005 | ||
PT | 04.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 16.02.2005 | |
GB | 16.02.2005 | ||
IE | 16.02.2005 | ||
DK | 16.05.2005 | ||
SE | 16.05.2005 | ||
ES | 27.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 16.02.2005 | |
GB | 16.02.2005 | ||
DK | 16.05.2005 | ||
SE | 16.05.2005 | ||
ES | 27.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 16.02.2005 | |
SE | 16.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 16.02.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4744583 (BLACKWOOD LLOYD [US]) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A]DE4122778 (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2759634 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19711535 (CARTRON FAHRZEUGTEILE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19749544 |