EP1212577 - PROJECTILE FOR USE IN AN ELECTROMAGNETIC LAUNCHER AND METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Corporation 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | [2002/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAYLOR, Robert, J. 2816 Whisperwood Trail Dalworthington Gardens, TX 76016 / US | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Manke, Lars Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Manke, Lars (DE) Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00991870.7 | 25.08.2000 | [2002/24] | WO2000US40748 | Priority number, date | US19990384633 | 27.08.1999 Original published format: US 384633 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0131279 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1212577 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F41B6/00, F42B6/00 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
F42B6/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2002/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHOSS FÜR EINE ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE ABSCHUSSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2002/24] | English: | PROJECTILE FOR USE IN AN ELECTROMAGNETIC LAUNCHER AND METHOD THEREFOR | [2002/24] | French: | PROJECTILE UTILISE DANS UN LANCEUR ELECTROMAGNETIQUE ET SON PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | [2002/24] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 01.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/36] | 04.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5237904 (KUHLMANN-WILSDORF DORIS [US]) [X] 1,12,13,24,35 * abstract * * column 20, line 37 - column 21, line 41 *; | [AD]US4741271 (DELVECCHIO ROBERT M [US], et al) [AD] * figures 7-12 * * column 4, line 6 - line 43 *; | [A]US4449441 (MCALLISTER DAN R [US]) [A] * abstract * * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 15 * | by applicant | US5189244 | US4741271 |