EP1208030 - LATENCY HANDLING FOR INTERCONNECTED DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANIGAN, Peter, J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SHEPHERD, Nicoll, B. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | White, Andrew Gordon Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | White, Andrew Gordon Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2002/22] | White, Andrew Gordon Philips Corporate Intellectual Property, Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00991982.0 | 20.12.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000EP12984 | Priority number, date | GB20000000874 | 14.01.2000 Original published format: GB 0000874 | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0151340 | Date: | 19.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1208030 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1208030 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
H04L12/2805 (EP,US);
H04L7/00 (KR);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04N21/23608 (EP,US);
H04N21/2368 (EP,US);
H04N21/43076 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4341 (EP,US);
H04N21/4344 (EP,US);
H04N21/436 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2002/22] | B62D53/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/44] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZEITVERZÖGERUNG FÜR VERBUNDENE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2002/22] | English: | LATENCY HANDLING FOR INTERCONNECTED DEVICES | [2002/22] | French: | GESTION DE TEMPS D'ATTENTE POUR DISPOSITIFS INTERCONNECTES | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 06.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5570372 (SHAFFER SHMUEL [US]) [X] 1-4,8-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 52 - line 67 * * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 4 * * column 4, line 13 - line 30 * * column 5, line 54 - line 65 *; | [Y]US5953049 (HORN DAVID N [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,8-12 * column 1, line 14 - line 26 * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 15 * * column 12, line 40 - line 64 * * figure 2A *; | [Y]EP0418396 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4,8-12 * abstract * * page 12, line 52 - page 13, line 22 *; | [A]US5969750 (HSIEH PETER H [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 6 - line 27 * * column 4, line 24 - line 46 * * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 11 *; | [A]US5751694 (TOFT ROLF [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A] - "THE HAVi ARCHITECTURE, VERSION 0.8", HAVI ARCHITECTURE,XX,XX, (19980515), no. 8, pages 6 - 18, XP002089719 [A] 1 * the whole document * |