EP1250265 - LINER AND CARTON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giblin, Edward John, Unilever Research U.S. Inc. 45 River Road Edgewater, NJ 07020 / US | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/03] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2002/43] | Elliott, Peter William Unilever PLC Patent Department, Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00991985.3 | 20.12.2000 | [2002/43] | WO2000EP13054 | Priority number, date | US19990473593 | 29.12.1999 Original published format: US 473593 | [2002/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0149578 | Date: | 12.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1250265 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1250265 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/56 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
B65D5/566 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INNENEINLAGE UND KARTON | [2002/43] | English: | LINER AND CARTON | [2002/43] | French: | DOUBLURE ET CAISSE EN CARTON | [2002/43] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 11.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.03.2005 | BE | 23.03.2005 | FI | 23.03.2005 | TR | 23.03.2005 | DK | 23.06.2005 | GR | 23.06.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | CY | 20.12.2005 | IE | 20.12.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2006/51] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 20.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 20.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 23.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3891137 (ELLISON DONALD E, et al) [DA] 1-23 * column 1, line 47 - line 57 * * column 3, line 23 - line 44; figure - *; | [DA]US5039002 (SPAMER WILLIAM S [US]) [DA] 1-23 * column 1, line 18 - line 35; figure - *; | [A]US5487504 (BAIRD WILLIAM J [US]) [A] 1,11,22,23 * column 1, line 23 - line 54 ** column 6, line 55 - line 67; figure - *; | [E]WO0105667 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [E] 1 * the whole document * |