EP1244447 - NOVEL METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS INVOLVING OPIOIDS AND ANTAGONISTS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adolor Corporation 700 Pennsylvania Drive Exton, PA 19341-1127 / US | [2007/11] |
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states Adolor Corporation 620 Pennsylvania Drive Exton, PA 19341-1127 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARRAR, John, J. 1066 Bodine Road Chester Springs, PA 19425 / US | [2002/40] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Eastcheap House Central Approach Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00992256.8 | 29.11.2000 | [2002/40] | WO2000US42315 | Priority number, date | US19990450806 | 29.11.1999 Original published format: US 450806 | [2002/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0137785 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1244447 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1244447 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/445, A61K31/485 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
A61K31/4748 (EP);
A61K31/445 (EP);
A61K31/485 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/445, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4748, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/485, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/40] | A61K31/445 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE VERFAHREN UND ZUBEREITUNGEN DIE OPIOIDEN UND DEREN ANTAGONISTEN ENTHALTEN | [2002/40] | English: | NOVEL METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS INVOLVING OPIOIDS AND ANTAGONISTS THEREOF | [2002/40] | French: | NOUVEAUX PROCEDES ET NOUVELLES COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES OPIOIDES ET DES ANTAGONISTES D'OPIOIDES | [2002/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2002 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 19.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.04.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Request for further processing for: | 14.04.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.05.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4457933 (GORDON MAXWELL [US], et al) [X] 1-42 * column 1, line 20 - line 31; example -; claim - *; | [X]US4582835 (LEWIS JOHN W [GB], et al) [X] 1-42 * examples 1-7; claim - *; | [X]US4769372 (KREEK MARY J [US]) [X] 1-42 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 9; claim - *; | [X]EP0287339 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [X] 1-42 * page 28, line 28 - line 38; claims 7,8; table 2 *; | [X] - WITTELS B ET AL, "OPIOID ANTAGONIST ADJUNCTS TO EPIDURAL MORPHINE FOR POSTCESAREAN ANALGESIA: MATERNAL OUTCOMES", ANESTHESIA AND ANALGESIA, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (199311), vol. 77, no. 5, ISSN 0003-2999, pages 925 - 932, XP001095958 [X] 1-42 * page 925 * * page 926, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 930, column R, paragraph L - page 931, column L, paragraph 1 * | [X] - GERAK L R ET AL, "CHANGES IN SENSITIVITY TO THE RAT-DECREASING EFFECTS OF OPIODIS IN PIGEONS TREATED ACUTELY OR CHRONICALLY WITH NALBUPHINE", BEHAVIOURAL PHARMACOLOGY, RAPID SCIENCE, PUBLISHERS, GB, (199610), vol. 5, no. 7, ISSN 0955-8810, pages 437 - 447, XP008005675 [X] 1-42 * page 439, column L, paragraph 2; figure 1 * | [XP] - GEAR R W ET AL, "ACTION OF NALOXONE ON GENDER-DEPENDENT ANALGESIC AND ANTIANALGESIC EFFECTS OF NALBUPHINE IN HUMANS", JOURNAL OF PAIN, SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20000621), vol. 1, no. 2, ISSN 1526-5900, pages 122 - 127, XP008005634 [XP] 1-42 * page 123, column L, line 4 - line 5; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1526-5900(00)90097-X | [PX] - VACCARINO A L ET AL, "Endogenous opiates: 1998.", PEPTIDES. UNITED STATES DEC 1999, (199912), vol. 20, no. 12, ISSN 0196-9781, pages 1527 - 1574, XP002236928 [PX] 1-42 * page 1543, column R, lines 5-8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0196-9781(99)00166-7 | International search | [Y]US5250542 (CANTRELL BUDDY E [US], et al); | [Y] - "Opiate analgesics", OSOL, Remington's pharmaceutical sciences, (1975), page 1098, XP001149582 [Y] * 15th Edition; page 1098 * | [Y] - WINDHOLZ, The merck index, an encyclopedia of chemicals, drugs and biologicals, (19860721), XP002942738 [Y] * 10th edition, no. 2423; page 350 * | Examination | - "Adolor targets pain/itch", WORLD PHARMACEUTICAL NEWS, (19990212), no. 2412 | - "Adolor to Develop Copound to Treat Narcotic-Induced Constipation; In-licensed From Roberts Pharmaceuticals", PR NEWSWIRE, (19980616), page 0616NYTU019 | - ZIMMERMANN ET AL, DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (1994), vol. 19, no. 12, pages 1078 - 1083 |