EP1286658 - GAMMA-IFN LIQUID-DROPLET AEROSOL AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/10] | Y-IFN LIQUID-DROPLET AEROSOL AND METHOD | ||
[2005/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intermune, Inc. 3280 Bayshore Boulevard Brisbane, CA 94005 / US | [2003/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMLEN, J., Woodruff 846 Lakeshore Drive Redwood City, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
VAN VLASSELAER, Peter 1065 Hickory Nut Court Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/10] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00992727.8 | 22.12.2000 | [2003/10] | WO2000US42831 | Priority number, date | US19990173926P | 30.12.1999 Original published format: US 173926 P | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0149260 | Date: | 12.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1286658 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1286658 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/08, A61K38/19 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
A61K9/0073 (EP,US);
A61K38/21 (KR);
A61K38/217 (EP,US);
A61M15/0028 (EP,US);
A61M15/0085 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GAMMA-IFN FLÜSSIGTROPFENAEROSOL UND VERFAHREN | [2005/46] | English: | GAMMA-IFN LIQUID-DROPLET AEROSOL AND METHOD | [2005/46] | French: | AEROSOL A GOUTTELETTES LIQUIDES DE GAMMA-IFN ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [2005/46] |
Former [2003/10] | Y-IFN FLÜSSIGES TROPFENAEROSOL UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2003/10] | Y-IFN LIQUID-DROPLET AEROSOL AND METHOD | ||
Former [2003/10] | AEROSOL A GOUTTELETTES LIQUIDES DE Y-IFN ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 14.10.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2006 | BE | 08.03.2006 | CH | 08.03.2006 | CY | 08.03.2006 | FI | 08.03.2006 | IT | 08.03.2006 | LI | 08.03.2006 | NL | 08.03.2006 | TR | 08.03.2006 | DK | 08.06.2006 | SE | 08.06.2006 | GR | 09.06.2006 | ES | 19.06.2006 | PT | 08.08.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
TR | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0257956 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * column 3, line 8 - line 25 * * column 4, line 32 - line 33 * * column 4, line 51 - line 65 * * page 7 - page 8; example 2 * * claims 1,2,4,6-9,14,17 *; | [Y]US5780012 (HULAND EDITH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-21 * column 4, line 40 - line 55 * * column 6, line 29 - line 40 * * example 5 * * claims 1,7 *; | [YD]US5971951 (RUSKEWICZ STEPHEN J [US]) [YD] 1-21 * column 1, line 51 - line 61 * * column 2, line 34 - line 52 * * column 9, line 61 - column 10, line 7 * * claim 1 *; | [A] - DEBS ET AL., "Lung-specific delivery of cytokines induces sustained pulmonary and systemic immunomodulation in rats", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 140, pages 3482 - 3488, XP001030667 [A] 1-21 * page 3482, column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 2 * * page 3482, line 44 - page 3483, line 17 * |