EP1238113 - DETECTION OF LUNG NEOPLASMS IN STOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/37] | SUPRACOLONIC AERODIGESTIVE NEOPLASM DETECTION | ||
[2009/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exact Sciences Corporation 100 Campus Drive Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | For all designated states Mayo Clinic 200 First Street, S.W. Rochester, MN 55905 / US | [2010/08] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states EXACT Sciences Corporation 100 Campus Drive Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | ||
For all designated states Mayo Clinic 200 First Street, S.W. Rochester, MN 55905 / US | |||
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Exact Sciences Corporation 63 Great Road Maynard, MA 01754 / US | ||
For all designated states Mayo Clinic 200 First Street, S.W. Rochester, MN 55905 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHUBER, Anthony, P. 11 Grant Street Milford, MA 01757 / US | 02 /
AHLQUIST, David, A. 200 First Street S.W. Rochester, MN 55905 / US | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9, Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2002/37] | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00992876.3 | 07.12.2000 | [2002/37] | WO2000US42683 | Priority number, date | US19990169457P | 07.12.1999 Original published format: US 169457 P | US20000196074P | 10.04.2000 Original published format: US 196074 P | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0142781 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1238113 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1238113 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C07K14/4746 (EP,US);
C07K14/82 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON LUNGENNEOPLASMEN IN FÄKALEN PROBEN | [2009/12] | English: | DETECTION OF LUNG NEOPLASMS IN STOOL | [2009/12] | French: | DETECTION DE NEOPLASMES DU POUMON DANS LES SELLES | [2009/12] |
Former [2002/37] | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON SUPRAKOLOREKTALEN ATEMWEGS- UND VERDAUUNGSNEOPLASMEN | ||
Former [2002/37] | SUPRACOLONIC AERODIGESTIVE NEOPLASM DETECTION | ||
Former [2002/37] | DETECTION DE NEOPLASMES AERODIGESTIFS SUPRACOLIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 04.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 20.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Request for further processing for: | 29.09.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 29.09.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.10.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.2006 | 31.12.2007 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2008 | 31.12.2008 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.02.2010 | BE | 24.02.2010 | CY | 24.02.2010 | DK | 24.02.2010 | FI | 24.02.2010 | IT | 24.02.2010 | NL | 24.02.2010 | SE | 24.02.2010 | TR | 24.02.2010 | GR | 25.05.2010 | ES | 04.06.2010 | PT | 24.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2011/14] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PT | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
PT | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
PT | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | PT | 24.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9320235 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS MED [US]) [X] 1-8,18-21,26,28 * claims 1-22 *; | [X]US5352775 (ALBERTSEN HANS [US], et al) [X] 1-8,16-21 * column 8, line 14 - line 41; claims 1-10 *; | [X]US5527676 (VOGELSTEIN BERT [US], et al) [X] 1-8,18-21 * claims 1-25 *; | [X]WO9709600 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) [X] 1-8,18-26,28 * page 11, line 37 - page 12, line 16 *; | [X]WO9719191 (OEGREID DAGFINN [NO], et al) [X] 1-8,18-21 * page 2; claims 1-8 *; | [X]DE19712332 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10,16-21,26,28 * page 1 - page 2 *; | [X]GB2327497 (ZENECA LTD [GB]) [X] 1-8,18-21,26,28 * page 4, line 14 - line 19; claims 1,2; table 1 *; | [X]WO9953316 (EXACT LAB INC [US]) [X] 1-9,18-21,26,28 * page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 26 *; | [A] - GIACONA MARY BETH ET AL, "Cell-free DNA in human blood plasma: Length measurements in patients with pancreatic cancer and healthy controls.", PANCREAS, (199807), vol. 17, no. 1, ISSN 0885-3177, pages 89 - 97, XP000992791 [A] 11-15,27,29 * table 1 * | Examination | - CALDAS ET AL, "DETECTION OF K-RAS MUTATIONS IN THE STOOL OF PATIENTS WITH PANCREATIC ADENOCARCINOMA AND PANCREATIC DUCTAL HYPERPLASIA", CANCER RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 54, no. 13, pages 3568 - 3573, XP002050203 | by applicant | WO9320235 | WO9709600 | WO9719191 | DE19712332 | - LANDIS ET AL., CA CANCER J CLIN., (1998), vol. 48, pages 6 - 29 | - SIDRANSKY ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 256, pages 102 - 105 | - GIACONA MARY BETH ET AL., PANCREAS, (1998), vol. 17, no. 1 | - CALDAS ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 54, no. 13, pages 3568 - 3573 |