EP1234224 - SIP-BASED FEATURE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MCI Worldcom, Inc. 515 East Amite Street Jackson, MS 39201 / US | [2002/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONOVAN, Steven, R. 704 Forest Bend Drive Plano, TX 75025 / US | 02 /
DEVANATHAN, Raghavan 3109 Lanarc Drive Plano, TX 75023 / US | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Harald Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Hofmann, Harald Sonnenberg Fortmann, Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00993000.9 | 08.11.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000US41969 | Priority number, date | US19990436793 | 08.11.1999 Original published format: US 436793 | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0144890 | Date: | 21.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1234224 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.12.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04M7/00, H04M3/42, H04L29/06 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
H04M3/42314 (EP,US);
H04L65/1104 (EP,US);
H04L65/1096 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04M7/006 (EP,US);
H04L69/327 (EP,US);
H04M3/436 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/05] | G06F15/16 | ||
Former IPC [2002/35] | G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIP-BASIERENDE AUSFÜHRUNGSSTEUERUNG | [2002/35] | English: | SIP-BASED FEATURE CONTROL | [2002/35] | French: | COMMANDE DE CARACTERISTIQUE FONDEE SUR LE PROTOCOLE D'INITIATION DE SESSION (SIP) | [2002/35] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2002 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 22.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/32] | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ROSENBERG J ET AL, "PROGRAMMING INTERNET TELEPHONY SERVICES", IEEE NETWORK, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199905), vol. 13, no. 3, ISSN 0890-8044, pages 42 - 49, XP000870630 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.767138 | [X] - LENNOX ET AL, "TRANSPORTING USER CONTROL INFORMATION IN SIP REGISTER PAYLOADS", INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, XX, XX, (19990223), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://www1.cs.columbia.edu/~lennox/draft-lennox-sip-reg-payload-00.pdf, (20031127), XP002263274 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5699359 (SUGA TAKAAKI [JP]); | [YP]US6094525 (PERLMAN RADIA J [US], et al); | [YE]US6202081 (NAUDUS STANLEY T [US]) |