EP1233744 - COLOURING AGENT FOR KERATIN CONTAINING FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2005/49] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSE, David Am Eichelkamp 223 40723 Hilden / DE | 02 /
HÖFFKES, Horst Carlo-Schmid-Strasse 113 40595 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
MEINIGKE, Bernd Wuppertalstrasse 84b 51381 Leverkusen / DE | [2002/35] | Application number, filing date | 00993035.5 | 13.10.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000EP10074 | Priority number, date | DE1999151010 | 22.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19951010 | [2002/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0134104 | Date: | 17.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1233744 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1233744 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/13 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
A61Q5/10 (EP);
A61K8/494 (EP);
A61K2800/59 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/35] | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUM FÄRBEN VON KERATINHALTIGEN FASERN | [2002/35] | English: | COLOURING AGENT FOR KERATIN CONTAINING FIBRES | [2002/35] | French: | AGENT POUR COLORER DES FIBRES A BASE DE KERATINE | [2002/35] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 13.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.12.2005 | FI | 07.12.2005 | IE | 07.12.2005 | IT | 07.12.2005 | NL | 07.12.2005 | DK | 07.03.2006 | GR | 07.03.2006 | SE | 07.03.2006 | ES | 18.03.2006 | PT | 08.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/35] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
IT | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
DK | 07.03.2006 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
ES | 18.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
DK | 07.03.2006 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
ES | 18.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
ES | 18.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
ES | 18.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
ES | 18.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
ES | 18.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
NL | 07.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [DY]DE4234887 (WELLA AG [DE]) [DY] 1-14 * claim 1 * * page 1, line 11 - line 20 * * page 2, line 10 - line 39 * * page 5, line 40 - line 48 ** examples 12-23 *; | [DY]EP0740931 (OREAL [FR]) [DY] 1-14 * claim 1 * * page 2, line 15 - line 36 * * examples 13,15,16,18 *; | [DY]DE19707545 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [DY] 1-14 * claim 7 * * page 2, line 39 - page 3, line 26 * * example 2 * |