EP1240041 - JOINING OF A VEHICLE PANE TO A CONTIGUOUS ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2002/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORNILS, Gerd Dechant-Fabry-Strasse 48 52399 Merzenich-Ginbelsrath / DE | 02 /
FISCHER, Florian Ottostr. 80 52070 Aachen / DE | 03 /
BEHREND, Ulrich Gracht 12 52224 Stolberg/Gressenich / DE | 04 /
ORTEN, Thomas Kalfstr. 61 52159 Roetgen / DE | [2003/06] |
Former [2002/38] | 01 /
CORNILS, Gerd Dechant-Fabry-Strasse 48 52399 Merzenich-Ginbelsrath / DE | ||
02 /
FISCHER, Florian Ottostr. 80 52070 Aachen / DE | |||
03 /
BEHREND, Ulrich Moltkestr. 61 52224 Stolberg / DE | |||
04 /
ORTEN, Thomas Kalfstr. 61 52159 Roetgen / DE | Representative(s) | Cardin, Elise Département de la Propriété Industrielle Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Cardin, Elise Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00993501.6 | 21.12.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000FR03656 | Priority number, date | DE1999161706 | 21.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19961706 | [2002/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0145974 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1240041 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1240041 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60J1/02, B60J10/02 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
B60J1/02 (EP,KR,US);
B60J10/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Title | German: | ANFÜGEN EINER AUTOSCHEIBE AN EIN ANSCHLUSSELEMENT | [2002/38] | English: | JOINING OF A VEHICLE PANE TO A CONTIGUOUS ELEMENT | [2002/38] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE D'UNE VITRE DE VEHICULE A UN ELEMENT CONTIGU | [2002/38] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 20.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.03.2005 | FI | 09.03.2005 | IE | 09.03.2005 | DK | 09.06.2005 | GR | 09.06.2005 | [2006/14] |
Former [2006/13] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
IE | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 09.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0163195 (METZELER KAUTSCHUK [DE]) [A] 1-6 * claims 1-5 *; | [Y]DE8707322U (MEHLER VARIO SYTEM GMBH) [Y] 1,6,9-11 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE3606810 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [YD]DE3702555 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [YD] 1,6,9-11 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE3821457 (FLACHGLAS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE3843079 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0401091 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0490092 (HENNIGES GUMMI [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figures 2,3; claims 1-8 *; | [A]EP0611672 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR], et al) [A] 1-6* claims 1-5 * |