EP1242365 - Acyl pseudodipeptides which carry a functionalised auxiliary arm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/39] | ACYL PSEUDODIPEPTIDES WHICH CARRY A FUNCTIONALISED AUXILIARY ARM | ||
[2013/28] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OM Pharma 22, rue du Bois-du-Lan, P.O. Box 84 1217 Meyrin 2 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states OM Pharma 22, rue du Bois-du-Lan, P.O. Box 84 1217 Meyrin 2 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Jacques 31, chemin de la Moraine CH-1162 Saint-Prex / CH | 02 /
MARTIN, Olivier, Richard 62 bis, avenue Dauphine F-45100 Orléans / FR | 03 /
RODRIGUEZ, Sylvain 10 B, rue du Borgeaud CH-1196 Gland / CH | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Lecca, Patricia S. Cabinet Lecca 21, rue de Fécamp 75012 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Lecca, Patricia S. Cabinet Lecca 21 rue de Fécamp 75012 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/38] | Burtin, Jean-François Cabinet Gefib 55 rue Aristide Briand 92309 Levallois-Perret / FR | ||
Former [2002/39] | Burtin, Jean-François Cabinet GEFIB, 82, rue Baudin 92300 Levallois-Perret / FR | Application number, filing date | 00993510.7 | 21.12.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000FR03650 | Priority number, date | WO1999IB02038 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: PCT/IB99/02038 | [2002/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0146126 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1242365 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07C237/22, C07C323/60, C07F9/09, A61K39/39, A61K31/66, A61P37/02 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
A61K39/385 (EP,US);
A61K38/04 (US);
A61K47/6811 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C07C237/22 (EP,US);
C07C323/60 (EP,US);
C07F9/091 (EP,US);
C07K5/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 11.07.2002 | LV | 11.07.2002 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 11.07.2002 | SI | 11.07.2002 | Title | German: | Acylierte Pseudopeptide mit einer funktionalisierten Seitenkette | [2013/28] | English: | Acyl pseudodipeptides which carry a functionalised auxiliary arm | [2013/28] | French: | Pseudodipeptides acyles porteurs d'un bras auxiliaire fonctionnalisé | [2013/28] |
Former [2002/39] | ACYLIERTE PSEUDOPEPTIDE MIT EINER FUNKTIONALISIERTEN SEITENKETTE | ||
Former [2002/39] | ACYL PSEUDODIPEPTIDES WHICH CARRY A FUNCTIONALISED AUXILIARY ARM | ||
Former [2002/39] | PSEUDODIPEPTIDES ACYLES PORTEURS D'UN BRAS AUXILIAIRE FONCTIONNALISE | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 17.08.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 05.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/18] | 29.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/18] | Divisional application(s) | EP10186332.2 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 03.11.2010 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   13.02.2007 | 31.12.2007 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   12.03.2008 | 31.12.2012 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   10.01.2013 | 31.12.2013 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0519327 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]WO9514026 (OM LAB SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-41 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0668289 (SUNTORY LTD [JP]) [A] 1-41 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO0000462 (OM PHARMA [CH], et al) [PA] 1-41* the whole document * | Examination | WO9932428 | - MCGAHREN W.J. ET AL, "(.beta.-Lysyloxy)myoinositol guanidino glycoside antibiotics", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1981), vol. 46, no. 4, pages 792 - 799 | - MOON BYUNG JO; KIM SANG KOOK, "Synthesis of enkephalin degrading peptidase inhibitors", BULLETIN OF THE KOREAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1997), vol. 18, no. 7, pages 778 - 781 | - ROSTOVTSEVA L.I.; KIRYUSHKIN A.A., "Mass spectrometry in the investigation of .beta.-lysine-containing peptides", ORGANIC MASS SPECTROMETRY, (1972), vol. 6, no. 1, page 1-8 | - ROSTOVTSEVA L.I. ET AL, "Peptides of L-.beta.-lysine. IV. Structure and synthesis of the dipeptide isolated from streptothricin D", ZHURNAL OBSHCHEI KHIMII, (1971), vol. 41, no. 7, pages 1611 - 1616 | - ROSTOVTSEVA L.I. ET AL, "Peptides of L-.beta.-lysine. III. Synthesis and mass spectrometric study of peptides of L-.beta.-lysine", ZHURNAL OBSHCHEI KHIMII, (1971), vol. 41, no. 7, pages 1604 - 1611 |