|
04.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.06.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.10.2005 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.10.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2005 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
30.05.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2005 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2005 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2005 |
Note of consultation between member and appellant / representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.12.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.12.2003 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
16.10.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.05.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.03.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.03.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.03.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.03.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.03.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.03.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.03.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
21.02.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.11.2001 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.11.2001 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.11.2001 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.07.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
06.07.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.07.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.07.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.06.2001 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.06.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |