EP1181796 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING DATA FROM AN INTERROGATING DEVICE TO PORTABLE OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.2006 [2006/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75752 Paris 15ème / FR | [2005/21] |
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75752 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROCHON, Elisabeth 54, rue du Moucherotte F-38320 Poisat / FR | 02 /
THOMAS, Thierry 7, lotissement la Treille, Route du Pavillon F-38760 Varces-Allieres et Risset / FR | 03 /
BOUVIER DES NOES, Mathieu 3, rue Lachmann F-38000 Grenoble / FR | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/37] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Société BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/42] | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/09] | Signore, Robert, et al c/o BREVATOME, 3, rue du Dr. Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00993565.1 | 19.12.2000 | [2002/09] | WO2000FR03589 | Priority number, date | FR19990016067 | 20.12.1999 Original published format: FR 9916067 | [2002/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0147201 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1181796 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1181796 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/49, H03K7/10 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
H04L25/4904 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2002/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INFORMATIONSÜBERTRAGUNG VON EINER ABFRAGEVORRICHTUNG ZU TRAGBAREN GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2002/09] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING DATA FROM AN INTERROGATING DEVICE TO PORTABLE OBJECTS | [2002/09] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS D'UN DISPOSITIF INTERROGATEUR VERS DES OBJETS PORTATIFS | [2002/09] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 21.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 12.10.2005 | [2006/22] | Cited in | International search | [A]US5684871 (DEVON MARK DARYL [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 40 - column 6, line 53 * * column 9, line 49 - column 10, line 17 *; | [A]US5844942 (HICKS RANDALL G [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 5, line 20 - line 67 *; | [A]EP0681192 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 45 - page 3, line 52 * |