EP1152326 - A technique for providing continuous speech recognition as an alternative input device to limited processing power devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keesey, James L. c/o IBM UK Ltd, Int.Prop.Law, MP 110, Hursley Park Hursley, Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | 02 /
Wilmot, Gerald J. c/o IBM UK Ltd, Int.Prop.Law, MP 110, Hursley Park Hursley, Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual Property Law, MP 110, Hursley Park, Hursley Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 01000133.7 | 30.04.2001 | [2001/45] | Priority number, date | US20000202101P | 04.05.2000 Original published format: US 202101 P | US20000690313 | 17.10.2000 Original published format: US 690313 | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1152326 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1152326 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/16, G10L15/26 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
G10L15/30 (EP,US);
G06F3/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/45] | G06F3/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/45] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ausführung kontinuierlicher Spracherkennung als Alternativeingabegerät zu verarbeitungsleistungsbegrenzten Einheiten | [2001/45] | English: | A technique for providing continuous speech recognition as an alternative input device to limited processing power devices | [2001/45] | French: | Technique pour assurer la reconnaissance de parole continue comme dispositif d'entrée alternative aux dispositifs de puissance de traitement limitée | [2001/45] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 03.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/15] | 10.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0851403 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5-13 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 7 * * column 44, line 4 - column 45, line 31 * * column 2, line 34 - line 44 * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]WO9900719 (LERNOUT & HAUSPIE SPEECHPROD [BE]) [Y] 2-4 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 2 ** page 8, line 1 - line 6 * |