EP1154456 - Plasma display panel with protective layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/20] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2002/40] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2001/50] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bachmann, Peter Klaus, Philips C.I.Prop.GMBH Habsburgerallee 11 52064, Aachen / DE | 02 /
van Elsbergen, Volker, c/o Philips C.I.Prop.GMBH Habsburgerallee 11 52064, Aachen / DE | 03 /
Klein, Markus, c/o Philips C.I.Prop.GMBH Habsburgerallee 11 52064, Aachen / DE | 04 /
Snijkers, Rob, c/o Phlips C.I.Prop.GMBH Habsburgerallee 11 52064, Aachen / DE | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01000140.2 | 09.05.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | DE2000123341 | 12.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10023341 | [2001/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1154456 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1154456 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01J17/04, H01J17/49, H01J17/06 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
H01J11/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/46] | H01J17/04, H01J17/49 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/14] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Plasmabildschirm mit Schutzschicht | [2001/46] | English: | Plasma display panel with protective layer | [2001/46] | French: | Ecran à plasma avec couche protectrice | [2001/46] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/25] | 18.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JPH1154048 ; | [X]EP0764965 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 6 - line 13 * * column 11, line 8 - line 32 * * column 4, line 11 - line 13 *; | [A]US5993543 (AOKI MASAKI [JP], et al) [A] 2 * abstract * * column 4, line 52 - line 55 *; | [XP]EP1085554 (PHILIPS CORP INTELLECTUAL PTY [DE], et al) [XP] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] *; | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11054048 A 19990226 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [XD] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0038] * | [A] - WEI Q ET AL, "Preparation of superhard functionally graded tetrahedral amorphous carbon coatings by pulsed laser deposition", LASER-SOLID INTERACTIONS FOR MATERIALS PROCESSING, SYMPOSIUM (MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS VOL.617), LASER-SOLID INTERACTIONS FOR MATERIALS PROCESSING. SYMPOSIUM, SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA, 25-27 APRIL 2000, 2000, Warrendale, PA, USA, Mater. Res. Soc, USA, ISBN 1-55899-525-0, pages J7.7.1 - 6, XP002271771 [A] 1 * Introduction * * Conclusions * |