EP1193341 - Method and apparatus for preparing green liquor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kvaerner Power Oy Kelloportinkatu 1 D 33100 Tampere / FI | [2004/14] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states Kvaerner Pulping Oy Kelloportinkatu 1 D 33100 Tampere / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahtila, Pekka Riilahdentie 45 B 02260, Espoo / FI | 02 /
Ruohola, Tuomo Tuulikinkatu 14 33730, Tampere / FI | 03 /
Tamminen, Ari Kivipöytälänkuja 2 33920, Pirkkala / FI | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko, et al Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2002/14] | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 01000506.4 | 27.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | FI20000002153 | 29.09.2000 Original published format: FI 20002153 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1193341 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1193341 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | [2002/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193341 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D21C11/00 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
D21C11/00 (EP);
D21C11/0064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, PT, SE [2003/01] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Grünlauge | [2002/14] | English: | Method and apparatus for preparing green liquor | [2002/14] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la préparation de liqueur verte | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 04.11.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.01.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, TR | 11.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 11.05.2005 | DE | 12.08.2005 | ES | 22.08.2005 | PT | 19.10.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | DE | 12.08.2005 | |
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
FR | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | DE | 12.08.2005 | |
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | ES | 22.08.2005 | |
PT | 19.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4799994 (RIMPI PERTTI [FI]) [A] 1-8* claim 1 *; | [Y]US4808264 (KIGNELL JEAN-ERIK [SE]) [Y] 1-8 * column 4, line 4 - column 6, line 2; figure 1; claims 1-13 *; | [A]WO9324703 (CHEMREC AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5509999 (LINDBERG HANS G [US]) [A] 1-8 * figures 6,7 *; | [A]WO9723687 (COMBUSTION ENG [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5735331 (ENGDAHL HOLGER [FI], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,2; claims 1-20 *; | [Y]US6113739 (NILSSON BENGT [SE]) [Y] 1-8 * figures 1,2; claims 1-13 * |