EP1125843 - Device for handling blanks, especially banderoles for cigarette packages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | [2004/46] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co.) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Focke, Heinz Moorstrasse 64 27283 Verden / DE | 02 /
Röse, Jürgen Neddener Dorfstrasse 22 27308 Kirchlinteln / DE | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | Bolte, Erich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01100237.5 | 03.01.2001 | [2001/34] | Priority number, date | DE2000107089 | 16.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10007089 | [2001/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1125843 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1125843 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65B19/22 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
B65B43/145 (EP,US);
B65B19/228 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1773 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1778 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2002/21] |
Former [2001/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Handhabung von Zuschnitten, insbesondere Banderolen für Zigarettenpackungen | [2001/34] | English: | Device for handling blanks, especially banderoles for cigarette packages | [2001/34] | French: | Dispositif pour manipuler des flans, spécialement des banderoles d'emballages pour cigarettes | [2001/34] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 20.02.2002 | Observations by third parties | 23.02.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR | 14.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.04.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3929326 (SERAGNOLI ENZO) [X] 1,2,4,6 * column W *; | [A]US4907941 (FOCKE HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19808791 (ROVEMA GMBH [DE]) [A] 8* the whole document * | Examination | EP1060993 | other | EP1060993 |