EP1118709 - Coating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2001/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernert, Richard Ebertstrasse 48 89537 Giengen / DE | 02 /
Ueberschär, Manfred Kiefernweg 3 89547 Gerstetten / DE | 03 /
Wozny, Eckhard Bussardweg 53 89520 Heidenheim / DE | 04 /
Partheymüller, Dennis Carl-Schwenk-Strasse 6 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2001/30] | Application number, filing date | 01100243.3 | 03.01.2001 | [2001/30] | Priority number, date | DE2000101392 | 14.01.2000 Original published format: DE 10001392 | [2001/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1118709 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1118709 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | [2002/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1118709 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D21H23/36, B05C5/02 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
D21H23/36 (EP,US);
B05C5/0262 (EP,US);
B05C5/0283 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/30] | D21H23/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FI, FR, SE [2003/18] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Auftragsvorrichtung | [2001/30] | English: | Coating device | [2001/30] | French: | Dispositif d'enduction | [2001/30] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 26.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 29.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.04.2004 | [2006/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4375202 (MILLER BALTHASAR C [DE]) [A] 1-31 * figure 2 *; | [X]EP0319503 (VALMET PAPER MACHINERY INC [FI]) [X] 1-31 * figures 5-7 *; | [X]DE19524702 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-31 * figure - *; | [AD]EP0846804 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-31* the whole document *; | [X]DE29913677U (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [X] 1-31 * abstract *; | [PX]DE19858653 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [PX] 1-31 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 12 * * figure 1 * |